EP0147541 - Process and apparatus for the purification of circulating liquids [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.12.1987 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.08.2008 | Change - representative | published on 01.10.2008 [2008/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MANNESMANN Aktiengesellschaft Postfach 10 36 41 40027 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1985/28] | For all designated states MANNESMANN Aktiengesellschaft Postfach 10 36 41 D-40027 Düsseldorf / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Brüll, Werner Schwalmstrasse 17 D-4000 Düsseldorf / DE | 02 /
Frese, Elmar, Dipl.-Ing. Burgmüllerstrasse 46 D-4000 Düsseldorf / DE | [1985/28] | Representative(s) | Meissner, Peter E., et al Meissner & Meissner Patentanwaltsbüro Postfach 33 01 30 14171 Berlin / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/40] | Meissner, Peter E., et al Meissner & Meissner, Patentanwaltsbüro, Postfach 33 01 30 14171 Berlin / DE | ||
Former [1987/03] | Meissner, Peter E., Dipl.-Ing. Meissner & Meissner Patentanwaltsbüro, et al Postfach D-14199 Berlin / DE | Application number, filing date | 84111806.0 | 03.10.1984 | [1985/28] | Priority number, date | DE19833344404 | 08.12.1983 Original published format: DE 3344404 | [1985/28] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0147541 | Date: | 10.07.1985 | Language: | DE | [1985/28] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0147541 | Date: | 15.10.1986 | Language: | DE | [1986/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.08.1986 | Classification | IPC: | B01D37/00, B01D21/01 | [1985/28] | CPC: |
B01D36/04 (EP);
B01D21/0012 (EP);
B01D21/08 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1985/28] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Reinigung von Kreislauf-Flüssigkeiten | [1985/28] | English: | Process and apparatus for the purification of circulating liquids | [1985/28] | French: | Procédé et dispositif de purification des liquides de circulation | [1985/28] | File destroyed: | 18.05.1993 | Examination procedure | 04.11.1986 | Examination requested [1987/02] | 07.04.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.08.1987 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1988/06] | 15.09.1987 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1988/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.10.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 02.11.1987 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE1101671 ; | [X]DE1028270 ; | [Y]EP0048448 ; | [A]FR2493719 |