EP0139264 - Device for reversing the rotation of the header auger of a combine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1985/18] | Device for reversing the header auger of a combine | ||
[1987/04] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.11.1987 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.09.2008 | Change - representative | published on 08.10.2008 [2008/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Klöckner-Humboldt-Deutz AG Zweigniederlassung Fahr D-7702 Gottmadingen / DE | [1985/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ahle, Josef D-8881 Kicklingen 29 / DE | [1985/18] | Representative(s) | Leinweber & Zimmermann Patentanwalts-PartG mbB European Patent Attorneys Viktualienmarkt 8 80331 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/41] | Leinweber & Zimmermann European Patent Attorneys Patentanwälte Rosental 7 80331 München / DE | ||
Former [1985/18] | Patentanwälte Leinweber & Zimmermann Rosental 7/II Aufg. D-80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 84111830.0 | 03.10.1984 | [1985/18] | Priority number, date | DE19833336603 | 07.10.1983 Original published format: DE 3336603 | [1985/18] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0139264 | Date: | 02.05.1985 | Language: | DE | [1985/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0139264 | Date: | 21.01.1987 | Language: | DE | [1987/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.02.1985 | Classification | IPC: | A01D41/12 | [1985/18] | CPC: |
A01D69/00 (EP);
A01D41/12 (EP);
A01D41/142 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, FR, GB, SE [1985/18] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum Rückdrehen der Einzugsschnecke eines Mähdreschers | [1985/18] | English: | Device for reversing the rotation of the header auger of a combine | [1987/04] | French: | Dispositif pour inverser le sens de rotation de la vis d'alimentation d'une moissonneuse-batteuse | [1987/04] |
Former [1985/18] | Device for reversing the header auger of a combine | ||
Former [1985/18] | Dispositif pour retourner la vis d'alimentation d'une moissonneuse-batteuse | File destroyed: | 17.07.1996 | Examination procedure | 18.03.1985 | Examination requested [1985/23] | 10.04.1986 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 22.07.1986 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.10.1986 | Fee for grant paid | 17.10.1986 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.10.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit [1988/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.09.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | US4133225 [ ]; | GB2024963 [ ]; | DE2410462 [ ]; | US4038880 [ ] |