EP0142013 - Portable memory for recording, storing and reproducing data [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.06.1991 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.10.2009 | Change - representative | published on 02.12.2009 [2009/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states EVERY-SYS AG Industriegebiet Färch CH-9630 Wattwil / CH | [1988/22] |
Former [1985/21] | For all designated states Marte, Gerhard Unter der Bahn 3 A-6840 Götzis/Vlbg. / AT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Marte, Gerhard Unter der Bahn 3 A-6840 Götzis / AT | [1988/22] |
Former [1985/21] | 01 /
see applicant ... | Representative(s) | Frei, Alexandra Sarah Frei Patentanwaltsbüro Postfach 1771 8032 Zürich / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2009/49] | Frei, Alexandra Sarah Frei Patentanwaltsbüro Postfach 1771 8032 Zürich / CH | ||
Former [1991/02] | Frei, Alexandra Sarah Frei Patentanwaltsbüro Hedwigsteig 6 Postfach 95 CH-8029 Zürich / CH | ||
Former [1988/14] | Frei, Alexandra Sarah Frei Patentanwaltsbüro Hedwigsteig 6 Postfach 95 CH-8029 Zürich / CH | ||
Former [1988/09] | (deleted) | ||
Former [1987/52] | Riebling, Peter, Dr.-Ing. Patentanwalt Dr.-Ing. P. Riebling, Postfach 31 60 D-88113 Lindau / DE | ||
Former [1985/21] | Riebling, Günter, Dr. Patentanwalt Dr.-Ing. P. Riebling, Postfach 31 60 D-88113 Lindau / DE | Application number, filing date | 84112000.9 | 06.10.1984 | [1985/21] | Priority number, date | AT19830003668 | 14.10.1983 Original published format: AT 366883 | [1985/21] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0142013 | Date: | 22.05.1985 | Language: | DE | [1985/21] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0142013 | Date: | 20.01.1988 | Language: | DE | [1988/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.11.1987 | Classification | IPC: | G06F1/00, G06F12/14 | [1988/03] | CPC: |
G07F7/1008 (EP);
G06F21/86 (EP);
G06K19/073 (EP);
G06K19/07372 (EP);
G06K7/10336 (EP);
G06Q20/346 (EP);
|
Former IPC [1988/01] | G06F1/00, G06F1/00 | ||
Former IPC [1985/21] | G06F12/14, G06F1/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1985/21] | Title | German: | Tragbarer Datenträger zur Aufnahme, Speicherung und Wiedergabe von Informationsdaten | [1985/21] | English: | Portable memory for recording, storing and reproducing data | [1985/31] | French: | Mémoire portable pour l'enregistrement, le stockage et la reproduction d'information | [1985/31] | File destroyed: | 02.03.1998 | Examination procedure | 13.07.1988 | Examination requested [1988/37] | 17.05.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.11.1990 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1991/33] | 11.01.1991 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1991/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.04.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.12.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.10.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.10.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.1986 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   28.04.1987 | 02.11.1987 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   17.12.1987 | 31.10.1990 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]DE3023427 (GRETAG AG); | [YD]DE2738113 (DETHLOFF JUERGEN); | [Y]US3922649 (THOME RICHARD J); | [Y]DE2711749 (HONEYWELL INC); | [A]US3806874 (EHRAT K); | [A]US4320387 (POWELL WILLIAM S) | [A] - IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN, Band 23, Nr. 7A, Dezember 1980, Seiten 2960-2961, New York, US; D.E. SCHREIBER: "Data and program secure microprocessor system" |