EP0142051 - Power transmisson cable, such as a loudspeaker cable [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.08.1987 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.12.2009 | Change - representative | published on 13.01.2010 [2010/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Audioplan, Renate Kühn Rosenstrasse 50 D-7502 Malsch 1 / DE | [1985/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kühn, Volker Rosenstrasse 50 D-7502 Malsch / DE | 02 /
Kühn, Thomas Rosenstrasse 50 D-7502 Malsch / DE | [1985/21] | Representative(s) | Lempert, Jost, et al LICHTI Patentanwälte Postfach 41 07 60 76207 Karlsruhe / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/02] | Lempert, Jost, et al LICHTI Patentanwälte Postfach 41 07 60 76207 Karlsruhe / DE | ||
Former [1985/21] | Lempert, Jost, Dipl.-Phys. Dr.rer.nat., et al Patentanwälte, Dipl.-Ing. Heiner Lichti Dipl.-Phys. Dr. rer. nat. Jost Lempert, Dipl.-Ing.Hartmut Lasch, Postfach 41 07 60 D-76207 Karlsruhe / DE | Application number, filing date | 84112385.4 | 13.10.1984 | [1985/21] | Priority number, date | DE19833337433 | 14.10.1983 Original published format: DE 3337433 | [1985/21] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0142051 | Date: | 22.05.1985 | Language: | DE | [1985/21] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0142051 | Date: | 23.07.1986 | Language: | DE | [1986/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.06.1986 | Classification | IPC: | H01B11/10, H01B11/20 | [1985/21] | CPC: |
H01B11/20 (EP,US);
H01B11/1033 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, SE [1985/21] | Title | German: | Kabel zur Leistungsübertragung, wie Lautsprecherkabel | [1985/21] | English: | Power transmisson cable, such as a loudspeaker cable | [1985/21] | French: | Câble de transmission de puissance, tel que câble de haut-parleur | [1985/21] | File destroyed: | 24.05.1993 | Examination procedure | 26.01.1987 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1987/39] | 24.04.1987 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1987/39] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 23.01.1987 | M02   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.1986 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR778374 ; | [Y]DE2830736 (KERNFORSCHUNGSZ KARLSRUHE); | [Y]GB2029628 (TSUKAMOTO K); | [A]GB2066588 (SECR DEFENCE) |