EP0140287 - Polarity-reversable electrode [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.12.1989 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.04.2002 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): FR | published on 12.06.2002 [2002/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Heraeus Elektroden GmbH Heraeusstrasse 12 - 14 D-6450 Hanau/Main / DE | [1985/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Fabian, Peter Theodor-Heuss-Strasse 4 D-6463 Freigericht 1 / DE | 02 /
Kotowski, Stephan, Dr. Mainring 8 D-6453 Seligenstadt / DE | 03 /
Busse, Bernd, Dr. Löfflerweg 6 D-6100 Darmstadt 13 / DE | [1985/19] | Representative(s) | Heinen, Gerhard W.C. Heraeus GmbH Zentralbereich Patente und Lizenzen Heraeusstrasse 12-14 63450 Hanau / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1985/19] | Heinen, Gerhard, Dr. W.C. Heraeus GmbH Zentralbereich Patente und Lizenzen Heraeusstrasse 12-14 D-63450 Hanau / DE | Application number, filing date | 84112538.8 | 17.10.1984 | [1985/19] | Priority number, date | DE19833339566 | 02.11.1983 Original published format: DE 3339566 | DE19830031360U | 02.11.1983 Original published format: DE 8331360 U | [1985/19] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0140287 | Date: | 08.05.1985 | Language: | DE | [1985/19] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0140287 | Date: | 03.07.1985 | Language: | DE | [1985/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0140287 | Date: | 22.02.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/08] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.04.1985 | Classification | IPC: | C25B11/10, C25B1/04, C25B1/26 | [1985/19] | CPC: |
B03D1/1437 (EP);
C02F1/46109 (EP);
C25B11/02 (EP);
C25B11/091 (EP);
C02F1/465 (EP);
C02F2001/46142 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1985/19] | Title | German: | Umpolbare Elektrode | [1985/19] | English: | Polarity-reversable electrode | [1985/31] | French: | Electrode à polarité inversable | [1985/31] | Examination procedure | 26.10.1984 | Examination requested [1985/19] | 14.03.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.07.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.11.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.03.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.09.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.12.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.07.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 25.08.1988 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.09.1988 | Fee for grant paid | 07.09.1988 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.11.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit [1990/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.08.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.09.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.09.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 22.02.1989 | FR | 22.02.1989 | AT | 17.10.1989 | SE | 18.10.1989 | CH | 31.10.1989 | LI | 31.10.1989 | LU | 31.10.1989 | [2002/24] |
Former [1999/52] | BE | 22.02.1989 | |
AT | 17.10.1989 | ||
SE | 18.10.1989 | ||
CH | 31.10.1989 | ||
LI | 31.10.1989 | ||
LU | 31.10.1989 | ||
Former [1991/29] | BE | 22.05.1989 | |
AT | 17.10.1989 | ||
SE | 18.10.1989 | ||
CH | 31.10.1989 | ||
LI | 31.10.1989 | ||
Former [1990/45] | BE | 22.05.1989 | |
SE | 18.10.1989 | ||
CH | 31.10.1989 | ||
LI | 31.10.1989 | ||
Former [1990/29] | BE | 22.05.1989 | |
SE | 18.10.1989 | ||
Former [1990/27] | BE | 22.05.1989 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]FR2213101 (HOECHST AG [DE]); | [Y]GB2113718 (IMI MARSTON LTD); | [A]US3822204 (SAKO F, et al); | [A]EP0047595 (IMI MARSTON LTD [GB]) |