EP0140301 - Method and device for enveloping packages or bundles in stretch-foil [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.05.1988 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.05.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 29.06.1988 [1988/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states B. Hagemann & Co. Friedrich-Ebert-Strasse 7-9 D-4430 Steinfurt-Burgsteinfurt / DE | [1985/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Silbernagel, Peter Weilautstrasse 18 D-4434 Ochtrup / DE | [1985/19] | Representative(s) | Patentanwälte Schulze Horn und Hoffmeister Goldstrasse 36 48147 Münster / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1985/19] | Patentanwälte Schulze Horn und Hoffmeister Goldstrasse 36 D-48147 Münster / DE | Application number, filing date | 84112608.9 | 19.10.1984 | [1985/19] | Priority number, date | DE19833339337 | 29.10.1983 Original published format: DE 3339337 | [1985/19] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0140301 | Date: | 08.05.1985 | Language: | DE | [1985/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0140301 | Date: | 15.07.1987 | Language: | DE | [1987/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.03.1985 | Classification | IPC: | B65B11/00, B65B11/58 | [1985/19] | CPC: |
B65B11/008 (EP,US);
B65B11/58 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1985/19] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Einhüllen von Packstücken oder Gebinden in Stretchfolie | [1985/19] | English: | Method and device for enveloping packages or bundles in stretch-foil | [1985/19] | French: | Procédé et dispositif pour envelopper des paquets dans une feuille étirable | [1985/19] | Examination procedure | 09.10.1985 | Examination requested [1985/51] | 05.03.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.07.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.09.1986 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 16.01.1987 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.03.1987 | Fee for grant paid | 24.03.1987 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.04.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit [1988/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.10.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE2303590 (TRANSPAK CONSULTING AB OY) |