EP0171461 - Spectacles [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.11.1990 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.11.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 27.12.1990 [1990/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states EYEMETRICS-SYSTEMS AG Steinbockstrasse 4 CH-7001 Chur / CH | [1988/40] |
Former [1986/15] | For all designated states Anger, Wilhelm Chesa Pas-chüra CH-7500 St. Moritz-Suvretta / CH | ||
Former [1986/08] | For all designated states Anger, Wilhelm Via Brattas 4 CH-7500 St. Moritz / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1986/08] | Representative(s) | Grams, Klaus Dieter, et al Patentanwaltsbüro Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1989/05] | Grams, Klaus Dieter, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwaltsbüro Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner Bavariaring 4 D-80336 München / DE | ||
Former [1988/40] | Grams, Klaus Dieter, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwaltsbüro Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne- Grupe-Pellmann-Grams-Struif-Winter-Roth Bavariaring 4 D-8000 München 2 / DE | ||
Former [1986/08] | Grams, Klaus Dieter, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwaltsbüro Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner Bavariaring 4 D-80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 84112881.2 | 25.10.1984 | [1986/08] | Priority number, date | DE19843429089 | 07.08.1984 Original published format: DE 3429089 | [1986/08] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0171461 | Date: | 19.02.1986 | Language: | DE | [1986/08] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0171461 | Date: | 18.03.1987 | Language: | DE | [1987/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0171461 | Date: | 17.01.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.01.1987 | Classification | IPC: | G02C5/12 | [1986/08] | CPC: |
G02C5/122 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1986/08] | Title | German: | Brille | [1986/08] | English: | Spectacles | [1986/08] | French: | Monture de lunettes | [1986/08] | Examination procedure | 30.03.1987 | Examination requested [1987/22] | 01.09.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.09.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.01.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.03.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 02.06.1989 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.08.1989 | Fee for grant paid | 31.08.1989 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.10.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit [1990/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.09.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.10.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.10.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.10.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE7428158U ; | [A]DE2511462 (KURT SCHWAGER KG); | [A]DE2558122 (LAIB OTTO KG); | [A]DE2616432 (MARWITZ & HAUSNER); | [A]DE2835116 (MENRAD FERDINAND FA) | Examination | GB869874 |