EP0142743 - Photographic-copying apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.01.1989 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.01.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 22.02.1989 [1989/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Agfa-Gevaert AG Kaiser-Wilhelm-Allee 51373 Leverkusen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1985/22] | For all designated states Agfa-Gevaert AG Kaiser-Wilhelm-Allee D-51373 Leverkusen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nitsch, Wilhelm, Dr. Werdenfelsstrasse 39 D-8000 München 70 / DE | 02 /
Kieslich, Walter, Dipl.-Ing. Glückstrasse 2 D-8000 München 2 / DE | 03 /
Treiber, Helmut, Dr. Bertelestrasse 67 D-8000 München 71 / DE | [1985/22] | Application number, filing date | 84112975.2 | 27.10.1984 | [1985/22] | Priority number, date | DE19833339960 | 04.11.1983 Original published format: DE 3339960 | [1985/22] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0142743 | Date: | 29.05.1985 | Language: | DE | [1985/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0142743 | Date: | 02.03.1988 | Language: | DE | [1988/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.03.1985 | Classification | IPC: | G03B27/34, G02B7/10 | [1985/22] | CPC: |
G03B27/34 (EP,US);
G02B7/10 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, GB, LI [1985/22] | Title | German: | Fotografisches Kopiergerät | [1985/22] | English: | Photographic-copying apparatus | [1985/22] | French: | Appareil de copiage photographique | [1985/22] | Examination procedure | 27.10.1984 | Examination requested [1985/22] | 21.07.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.10.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.12.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.03.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.05.1987 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 01.09.1987 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.09.1987 | Fee for grant paid | 10.09.1987 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.12.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit [1989/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.09.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.09.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US4161756 (THOMAS OTTO [DE]); | [YD]DE2917176 (RODENSTOCK OPTIK G); | [A]DE3107075 (DAINIPPON SCREEN MFG [JP]) | Examination | EP0075854 |