EP0148352 - Device to supply fluid to a consumer [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.01.1989 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.01.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 15.03.1989 [1989/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Denk, Herbert Ortsrand Echenbrunn 7 D-8883 Gundelfingen / DE | [1985/29] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1985/29] | Representative(s) | Munk, Ludwig Patentanwälte Munk Prinzregentenstrasse 3 86150 Augsburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1985/29] | Munk, Ludwig, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwalt Prinzregentenstrasse 1 D-86150 Augsburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 84113172.5 | 02.11.1984 | [1985/29] | Priority number, date | DE19833340467 | 09.11.1983 Original published format: DE 3340467 | [1985/29] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0148352 | Date: | 17.07.1985 | Language: | DE | [1985/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0148352 | Date: | 30.03.1988 | Language: | DE | [1988/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.04.1985 | Classification | IPC: | F17D5/04, F15B20/00, B23Q1/00 | [1985/29] | CPC: |
F16L39/02 (EP);
B23Q1/0018 (EP);
F15B20/00 (EP);
F17D5/04 (EP);
F16L2201/30 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI [1985/29] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zur Flüssigkeitsversorgung eines Verbrauchers | [1985/29] | English: | Device to supply fluid to a consumer | [1985/29] | French: | Dispositif d'alimentation en fluide d'un consommateur | [1985/29] | Examination procedure | 19.12.1985 | Examination requested [1986/10] | 04.12.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M07) | 26.06.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.09.1987 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 02.10.1987 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.12.1987 | Fee for grant paid | 02.12.1987 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 31.12.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit [1989/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.11.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.11.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | US2838074 [ ] (LAUCK JOHN A); | US2956586 [ ] (ZEIGLER PHILIP B, et al); | FR2377571 [ ] (GEWERK EISENHUETTE WESTFALIA [DE]); | GB2023296 [ ] (GEWERK EISENHUETTE WESTFALIA); | US4268007 [ ] (CHITTENDEN JEREMY B) |