EP0141412 - Tape supply cartridge [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 18.11.1988 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KROY INC. 7720 East Evans Drive Scottsdale Arizona 85260 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1985/20] | For all designated states Kroy Inc. 7720 East Evans Drive Scottsdale Arizona 85260 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Richardson, Michael M. 5217 East Le Marche Avenue Scottsdale Arizona 85254 / US | 02 /
Schaffer, Douglas A. 7077 Delaney Avenue Inver Grove Heights Minnesota 55075 / US | [1985/20] | Representative(s) | Strehl Schübel-Hopf & Partner Maximilianstrasse 54 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1985/20] | Strehl Schübel-Hopf Groening & Partner Maximilianstrasse 54 D-80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 84113217.8 | 02.11.1984 | [1985/20] | Priority number, date | US19830549261 | 04.11.1983 Original published format: US 549261 | [1985/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0141412 | Date: | 15.05.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/20] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0141412 | Date: | 20.01.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.11.1987 | Classification | IPC: | B41J3/38, B41J32/00 | [1985/20] | CPC: |
B41J32/00 (EP,US);
B41J3/38 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1985/20] | Title | German: | Bandzufuhrkassette | [1985/31] | English: | Tape supply cartridge | [1985/20] | French: | Cartouche d'alimentation de ruban | [1985/31] | File destroyed: | 14.07.1995 | Examination procedure | 13.07.1988 | Examination requested [1988/37] | 07.11.1988 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1989/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.11.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.11.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.11.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP0061776 (KROY INC [US]); | [Y]US4368992 (GAGNEBIN GUSTAVE [CH]); | [E]EP0141411 (KROY INC [US]) |