EP0142125 - Conjugates of macromolecular compounds and hemoglobin, process for preparing them and medicine comprising them [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.10.1988 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.03.2010 | Change - representative | published on 14.04.2010 [2010/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Intermedicat GmbH Gerliswilstrasse 45 CH-6020 Emmenbrücke / CH | [1985/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
* * * | 02 /
* * * | [2007/32] |
Former [1985/21] | 01 /
* * * | ||
02 /
* * * | Representative(s) | dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/15] | von Kreisler Selting Werner Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | ||
Former [2009/29] | von Kreisler, Alek, et al Patentanwälte Von Kreisler-Selting-Werner Postfach 10 22 41 50462 Köln / DE | ||
Former [1985/21] | von Kreisler, Alek, Dipl.-Chem., et al Patentanwälte von Kreisler-Selting-Werner Postfach 10 22 41 D-50462 Köln / DE | Application number, filing date | 84113405.9 | 07.11.1984 | [1985/21] | Priority number, date | DE19833340592 | 10.11.1983 Original published format: DE 3340592 | [1985/21] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0142125 | Date: | 22.05.1985 | Language: | DE | [1985/21] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0142125 | Date: | 28.05.1986 | Language: | DE | [1986/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.04.1986 | Classification | IPC: | C07K17/02, A61K37/14 | [1985/21] | CPC: |
C07K17/02 (EP,US);
A61K47/60 (EP,US);
A61K47/61 (EP,US);
A61P7/08 (EP);
C07K14/805 (EP,US);
A61K38/00 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1985/21] | Title | German: | Konjugate makromolekularer Verbindungen an Hämoglobin, Verfahren zu ihrer Herstellung und sie enthaltende Arzneimittel | [1985/21] | English: | Conjugates of macromolecular compounds and hemoglobin, process for preparing them and medicine comprising them | [1985/28] | French: | Conjugués de composés macromoléculaires et d'hémoglobine, leur procédé de préparation et médicament les contenant | [1985/28] | File destroyed: | 05.08.1994 | Examination procedure | 18.11.1986 | Examination requested [1987/03] | 31.05.1988 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1988/49] | 07.07.1988 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [1988/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.12.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.1987 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD] - TETRAHEDRON, Band 37, 1981, Seiten 1723-1726, Pergamon Press Ltd., GB; J.E. BALDWIN et al.: "Synthesis of polymer-bound hemoglobin samples" | [A] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Band 96, Nr. 8, 22. Februar 1982, Seite 356, Zusammenfassung Nr. 57618u, Columbus, Ohio, US; G.V. SAMSONOV et al.: "Crosslinked polymer complex of hemoglobin simulating an erythrocyte" & DOKL. AKAD. NAUK SSSR 1981, 260(6), 1486-9 |