EP0141431 - Digital signal transmitting and/or receiving system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.02.1993 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.02.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 14.04.1993 [1993/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sony Corporation 7-35 Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1985/20] | For all designated states SONY CORPORATION 7-35 Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kondoh, Yoshiyuki c/o SONY CORPORATION 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Ishidoh, Takanobu c/o SONY CORPORATION 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo / JP | [1985/20] | Representative(s) | Ter Meer Steinmeister & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Nymphenburger Strasse 4 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1985/20] | TER MEER - MÜLLER - STEINMEISTER & PARTNER Mauerkircherstrasse 45 D-81679 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 84113562.7 | 09.11.1984 | [1985/20] | Priority number, date | JP19830210356 | 09.11.1983 Original published format: JP 21035683 | [1985/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0141431 | Date: | 15.05.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/20] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0141431 | Date: | 24.06.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0141431 | Date: | 22.04.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.05.1987 | Classification | IPC: | H04H1/00, H04N7/16, H04J3/04 | [1985/20] | CPC: |
H04H20/79 (EP,US);
H04H20/59 (EP,US);
H04H60/15 (EP,US);
H04H60/16 (EP,US);
H04H60/23 (EP,US);
H04J3/1605 (EP,US);
H04N7/16 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [1985/20] | Title | German: | Digitales Datenübertragungssystem | [1985/20] | English: | Digital signal transmitting and/or receiving system | [1985/20] | French: | Système de transmission de signaux numériques | [1985/20] | Examination procedure | 22.12.1987 | Examination requested [1988/09] | 12.07.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.01.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.03.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.07.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.01.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.05.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.07.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 24.10.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.01.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 17.01.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.01.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.11.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.11.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.11.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.11.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.11.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE3146466 (SIEMENS AG [DE], et al); | [A]DE3126880 (LICENTIA GMBH [DE]); | [A]EP0058417 (SONY CORP [JP]) | [XP] - IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON CONSUMER ELECTRONICS, vol. CE-30, no. 3, August 1984, pages 462-466, IEEE, New York, US; Y. KOJIMA et al.: "A new digital audio and data transmission system using the CATV network" | [A] - 13th INTERNATIONAL TV SYMPOSIUM, Montreux, CH, 28th May - 2nd June 1983, pages 236-243; S. DINSEL: "Distribution of satellite signals (TV and sound) on cable networks" | [A] - N.H.K. LABORATORIES NOTE, no. 282, November 1982, pages 1-13; T. YOSHINO et al.: "PCM sounds on digital subcarrier in television for a satellite broadcasting system" | [A] - 1978 INTERNATIONAL ZURICH SEMINAR ON DIGITAL COMMUNICATIONS, Zurich, CH, 7th-9th March 1978, pages H4.1-H4.6; H. HESSENMÜLLER et al.: "Multiplexing and transmission of digital sound-programme signals in local networks" |