EP0144804 - New 2,5-diaryl tetrahydrofurans and analogs thereof as paf-antagonists [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.12.1990 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.11.1999 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 29.12.1999 [1999/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Merck & Co., Inc. 126, East Lincoln Avenue P.O. Box 2000 Rahway New Jersey 07065-0900 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1985/25] | For all designated states MERCK & CO. INC. 126, East Lincoln Avenue P.O. Box 2000 Rahway New Jersey 07065-0900 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Biftu, Tesfaye 800 Forest Avenue Westfield New Jersey 07090 / US | 02 /
Hwang, San-Bao 67 Centerbury Drive Scotch Plains New Jersey 07076 / US | 03 /
Doebber, Thomas W. 2281 Elizabeth Avenue Scotch Plains New Jersey 07076 / US | 04 /
Beattie, Thomas R. 4 Heather Lane Scotch Plains New Jersey 07076 / US | 05 /
Shen, Tsung-Ying 935 Minisink Way Westfield New Jersey 07090 / US | [1985/25] | Representative(s) | Abitz, Walter, et al Patentanwälte Abitz & Partner Postfach 86 01 09 81628 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1985/25] | Abitz, Walter, Dr.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte Abitz & Partner Postfach 86 01 09 D-81628 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 84113600.5 | 12.11.1984 | [1985/25] | Priority number, date | US19830551666 | 14.11.1983 Original published format: US 551666 | [1985/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0144804 | Date: | 19.06.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/25] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0144804 | Date: | 08.01.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0144804 | Date: | 07.03.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/10] | Type: | B1 RE Reissue of patent specification | No.: | EP0144804 | Date: | 18.06.1990 | [1990/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.11.1985 | Classification | IPC: | C07D307/12, C07D307/18, C07D307/20, A61K31/34 | [1985/25] | CPC: |
C07D307/18 (EP,US);
A61P43/00 (EP);
C07C45/00 (EP,US);
C07C45/72 (EP,US);
C07D307/12 (EP,US);
C07D307/14 (EP,US);
C07D307/20 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C07C45/00, C07C49/84 (EP,US);
C07C45/72, C07C49/84 (US,EP) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1985/25] | Title | German: | 2,5-Diaryltetrahydrofurane und Analoge davon als Antagonisten für Thrombozyten aktivierenden Faktor | [1985/25] | English: | New 2,5-diaryl tetrahydrofurans and analogs thereof as paf-antagonists | [1985/25] | French: | 2,5-Diaryltétrahydrofurannes et analogues comme antagonistes de facteur activant de thrombocytes | [1985/25] | Examination procedure | 30.06.1986 | Examination requested [1986/36] | 01.10.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.01.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.03.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 02.05.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.09.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 06.02.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 10.04.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.04.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 23.05.1989 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.08.1989 | Fee for grant paid | 23.08.1989 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.12.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit [1991/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.10.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.10.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.10.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.10.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | LU | 30.11.1990 | [1999/52] | Documents cited: | Search | [X] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 42, no. 16, August 20, 1948, Columbus, Ohio, USA MARCEL T. et al.: "Aliphatic, arylaliphatic and cyclic(C14-C20) hydrocarbons" column 5833g (5836e); & Bull. soc. chim. France, 1947, pages 1086-96 | [A] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 90, no. 7, February 12, 1979, Columbus, Ohio, USA BIFTU, T. et al.: "Syntheses of lignans from 2,3-diaroylbutanes" page 592, column 1, abstract no. 54 746z; & J. Chem. Soc., Perkins Trans. I. 1978, no 10, pages 1147-1150 | [A] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 86, no. 3, January 17, 1977, Columbus, Ohio, USA AHMER R. et al.: "Oxidative coupling of bromo - and iodoferulic acid derivatives" page 406, column 1, abstract no. 16 468v; & Tetrahedron 1976, vol. 32, no. 12, pages 1339-1444 |