EP0146756 - Aqueous emulsions of carboxyl-containing silicone fluids and a method for their preparation [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.04.1989 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.04.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 31.05.1989 [1989/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DOW CORNING CORPORATION P.O. Box 1767 Midland Michigan 48640 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1985/27] | For all designated states DOW CORNING CORPORATION P.O. Box 1767 Midland Michigan 48640 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gee, Ronald Paul 6109 Sturgeon Creek, Parkway Midland, MI 48640 / US | [1988/22] |
Former [1985/27] | 01 /
Gee, Ronald Paul 6109 Sturgeon Creek Parkway Midland Michigan 48640 / US | Representative(s) | Hann, Michael, et al Patentanwälte Dr. Michael Hann Dr. H.-G. Sternagel Sander Aue 30 D-51465 Bergisch Gladbach / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1985/27] | Hann, Michael, Dr., et al Patentanwälte Dr. Michael Hann Dr. H.-G. Sternagel Sander Aue 30 D-51465 Bergisch Gladbach / DE | Application number, filing date | 84113626.0 | 12.11.1984 | [1985/27] | Priority number, date | US19830551625 | 14.11.1983 Original published format: US 551625 | [1985/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0146756 | Date: | 03.07.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0146756 | Date: | 01.06.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.04.1985 | Classification | IPC: | C08L83/06, C08L83/08, D06M15/643, C08J3/02 | [1985/27] | CPC: |
A61K8/893 (EP,US);
A61K8/068 (EP,US);
A61K8/39 (EP,US);
A61K8/899 (EP,US);
A61Q5/12 (EP,US);
C08J3/03 (EP,US);
C08J2383/04 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1985/27] | Title | German: | Wasserhaltige Emulsionen mit Carboxyl enthaltenden flüssigen Silikonen und ein Verfahren zu deren Herstellung | [1988/22] | English: | Aqueous emulsions of carboxyl-containing silicone fluids and a method for their preparation | [1985/27] | French: | Emulsions aqueuses de silicones fluides contenant des groupements carboxy et une méthode de préparation | [1985/27] |
Former [1985/27] | Wasserhaltige Emulsionen mit carboxyl enthaltenden flüssigen Silikonen und ein Verfahren zu deren Herstellung | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 16.12.1985 | Examination requested [1986/08] | 02.01.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.04.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.07.1987 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 06.11.1987 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.01.1988 | Fee for grant paid | 20.01.1988 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 02.03.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit [1989/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.11.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.11.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | US4146499 [ ] (ROSANO HENRI L); | US3812201 [ ] (BEY A); | US4311626 [ ] (ONA ISAO, et al); | EP0109214 [ ] |