EP0151703 - Directional filter for filtering ambient light [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.11.1989 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.11.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 17.01.1990 [1990/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ALLIED-SIGNAL INC. (a Delaware corporation) Columbia Road and Park Avenue P.O. Box 2245R Morristown New Jersey 07960 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1988/30] | For all designated states ALLIED-SIGNAL INC. (a Delaware corporation) Columbia Road and Park Avenue P.O. Box 2245R Morristown New Jersey 07960 / US | ||
Former [1985/34] | For all designated states ALLIED CORPORATION Columbia Road and Park Avenue P.O. Box 2245R (Law Dept.) Morristown New Jersey 07960 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Cohen, Richard Lawrence 81 Onyx Place Matawan New Jersey 07747 / US | [1985/34] | Representative(s) | Brock, Peter William Urquhart-Dykes & Lord 1 Richfield Place Richfield Avenue Reading RG1 8EQ Berkshire / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1989/08] | Brock, Peter William Urquhart-Dykes & Lord 1 Richfield Place Richfield Avenue Reading RG1 8EQ Berkshire / GB | ||
Former [1988/30] | Brock, Peter William ALLIED-SIGNAL INC. Law Department 48 Leicester Square London WC2H 7LW / GB | ||
Former [1988/08] | Brock, Peter William UOP Processes International Corporation 48 Leicester Square London WC2H 7LW / GB | ||
Former [1985/34] | Brullé, Jean Division Technique Service Brevets Bendix Europe 126, rue de Stalingrad F-93700 Drancy / FR | Application number, filing date | 84113661.7 | 13.11.1984 | [1985/34] | Priority number, date | US19830560689 | 12.12.1983 Original published format: US 560689 | [1985/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0151703 | Date: | 21.08.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0151703 | Date: | 25.01.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.06.1985 | Classification | IPC: | G02B5/00, G02B6/08 | [1985/34] | CPC: |
G02B27/0101 (EP,US);
G02B5/00 (EP,US);
G02B6/08 (EP,US);
H01J29/896 (EP,US);
G02B2027/0118 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1985/34] | Title | German: | Richtfilter zur Filterung von Umgebungslicht | [1985/34] | English: | Directional filter for filtering ambient light | [1985/34] | French: | Filtre directionnel pour filtrer la lumière ambiante | [1985/34] | File destroyed: | 16.07.1996 | Examination procedure | 17.02.1986 | Examination requested [1986/17] | 14.04.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.08.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.08.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.01.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.04.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 16.06.1988 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.08.1988 | Fee for grant paid | 12.08.1988 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.10.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit [1990/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.10.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.11.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.11.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]CH580285 (RAIMONDI RINALDO); | [Y]GB1008025 (GEORGES VALENSI); | [A]US2053173 (EUGENE ASTIMA); | [A]US3669789 (UTSUGI MIKIO, et al) |