EP0143391 - Food composition [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.11.1992 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.11.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 07.01.1993 [1993/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Vanlommel, Florent H. Gerhagenstraat 68 B-3980 Tessenderlo / BE | [1985/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1985/23] | Representative(s) | Pieraerts, Jacques, et al Gevers Intellectual Property House Holidaystraat 5 1831 Diegem / BE | [N/P] |
Former [1985/23] | Pieraerts, Jacques, et al GEVERS Patents, Brussels Airport Business Park, Holidaystraat 5 B-1831 Diegem / BE | Application number, filing date | 84113704.5 | 13.11.1984 | [1985/23] | Priority number, date | BE19830211869 | 14.11.1983 Original published format: BE 211869 | BE19840212889 | 07.05.1984 Original published format: BE 212889 | [1985/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0143391 | Date: | 05.06.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/23] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0143391 | Date: | 15.01.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0143391 | Date: | 15.01.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.11.1985 | Classification | IPC: | A23J3/04, A23J3/14, A23J3/16 | [1992/03] | CPC: |
A21D10/005 (EP);
A21D13/02 (EP);
A21D2/263 (EP);
A21D2/265 (EP);
A21D2/362 (EP);
A23J3/10 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1985/23] | A23J3/02 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, LI, LU, NL, SE [1985/23] | Title | German: | Nahrungsmittelzusammensetzung | [1985/29] | English: | Food composition | [1985/23] | French: | Composition alimentaire | [1985/29] | Examination procedure | 03.06.1986 | Examination requested [1986/32] | 14.01.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.05.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.10.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.02.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.06.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.12.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.05.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.09.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.04.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 30.05.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.11.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M01) | 23.11.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.02.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 23.05.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.08.1991 | Fee for grant paid | 10.08.1991 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.10.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.10.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.10.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.10.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.10.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.11.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 11.11.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 15.01.1992 | SE | 15.01.1992 | [1992/46] |
Former [1992/32] | SE | 15.01.1992 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]GB2085273 ; | [X]US4209545 ; | [X]WO8203749 |