EP0177637 - Bronze printing process for colour prints treated with a bronzing medium [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.02.1989 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.11.1999 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 29.12.1999 [1999/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Wanfried-Druck Kalden GmbH Postfach 1242 D-37278 Wanfried / DE | [1986/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Burhenne, Wolfgang Ringstrasse 55 D-3442 Wanfried 1 / DE | [1986/16] | Representative(s) | Jahn-Held, Wilhelm W. Schöne Aussicht 8 34355 Staufenberg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1986/16] | Jahn-Held, Wilhelm W. Dr.Dr.-Ing. Dipl.-Chem. Schöne Aussicht 8 D-34355 Staufenberg / DE | Application number, filing date | 84113757.3 | 14.11.1984 | [1986/16] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0177637 | Date: | 16.04.1986 | Language: | DE | [1986/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0177637 | Date: | 27.04.1988 | Language: | DE | [1988/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.09.1985 | Classification | IPC: | B41G1/00 | [1986/16] | CPC: |
B44C1/04 (EP);
B41G1/04 (EP);
B41M1/22 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1986/16] | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Bronzieren von mit Unterdruckfarbe behandelter Farbdrucke | [1986/16] | English: | Bronze printing process for colour prints treated with a bronzing medium | [1986/16] | French: | Procédé de bronzage d'imprimés polychromes traités avec un mordant | [1986/16] | Examination procedure | 03.12.1985 | Examination requested [1986/16] | 26.08.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.09.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.01.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.04.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.08.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 21.08.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.09.1987 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 27.10.1987 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.11.1987 | Fee for grant paid | 06.11.1987 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.02.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit [1989/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.11.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.01.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.1987 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   25.01.1988 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | LU | 30.11.1988 | [1999/52] | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]FR675581 ; | [Y]DE169373 ; | [Y]DE3224558 ; | [A]FR1126893 ; | [A]GB190916965 ; | [AD]EP0075755 ; | [A]DE2839501 ; | [A]DE675069 ; | [A]GB725884 ; | [A]GB1102658 ; | [A]DE174705 | [A] - F.A. ASKEN u.a.: "Printing ink manual", 2. Ausgabe, 1969, Seiten 316,336-338,342,350-352,364-365,387-388, Society of British printing ink manufacturers, Cambridge, GB; |