EP0143396 - Crystallite suspensions of crystalline, ethylenically unsaturated polyesters and polyhydroxyl compounds, process for their preparation and their use in preparating polyurethanes or polymers containing polyurethane groups [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.01.1992 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.01.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 04.03.1992 [1992/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BASF Aktiengesellschaft Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 67063 Ludwigshafen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1985/23] | For all designated states BASF Aktiengesellschaft Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 D-67063 Ludwigshafen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Horn, Peter, Dr. Neue Stuecker 15 D-6900 Heidelberg / DE | 02 /
Hesse, Anton, Dr. Peter-Nickel-Strasse 15 D-6940 Weinheim / DE | 03 /
Mann, Walter Kaethe-Kollwitz-Strasse 4a D-6710 Frankenthal / DE | 04 /
Frank, Wolfram, Dr. Bergstrasse 162 D-6900 Heidelberg / DE | 05 /
Marx, Matthias, Dr. Seebacher Strasse 49 D-6702 Bad Duerkheim / DE | 06 /
Heckmann, Walter, Dr. Geiersbergstrasse 2 D-6940 Weinheim / DE | [1985/23] | Application number, filing date | 84113763.1 | 14.11.1984 | [1985/23] | Priority number, date | DE19833342177 | 23.11.1983 Original published format: DE 3342177 | [1985/23] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0143396 | Date: | 05.06.1985 | Language: | DE | [1985/23] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0143396 | Date: | 30.04.1986 | Language: | DE | [1986/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0143396 | Date: | 13.03.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.03.1986 | Classification | IPC: | C08G18/40, C08J3/11, C08L67/06, C08L71/02 | [1991/11] | CPC: |
C08G18/4669 (EP,US);
C08G18/68 (EP,US);
C08G63/918 (EP,US);
C08G2115/02 (EP,US);
Y10S521/902 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1986/20] | C08G18/40, C08G63/76, C08J3/08, C08L67/06, C08L71/02, C08G18/42, C08G18/79 | ||
Former IPC [1986/19] | C08G18/40, C08G63/76, C08J3/08, C08L67/06, C08L71/02, C08G18/79 | ||
Former IPC [1985/23] | C08G18/40, C08G63/76, C08J3/08, C08L67/06, C08L71/02 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1985/23] | Title | German: | Kristallitsuspensionen aus kristallinen, ethylenisch ungesättigten Polyestern und Polyhydroxylverbindungen, Verfahren zu deren Herstellung und deren Verwendung zur Herstellung von Polyurethan- oder Polyurethangruppen enthaltenden Polyisocyanurat-Kunststoffen | [1985/23] | English: | Crystallite suspensions of crystalline, ethylenically unsaturated polyesters and polyhydroxyl compounds, process for their preparation and their use in preparating polyurethanes or polymers containing polyurethane groups | [1985/23] | French: | Suspensions de cristallites de polyesters cristallins à insaturation éthylénique et de composés polyhydroxylés, procédé pour leur préparation et leur utilisation pour la préparation des polyuréthanes ou des polymères polyisocyanurates contenant des groupes uréthanes | [1985/23] | Examination procedure | 16.10.1986 | Examination requested [1986/50] | 29.01.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.05.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.09.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 04.01.1989 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.04.1989 | Fee for grant paid | 17.04.1989 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.12.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit [1992/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.11.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.11.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.11.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 17.11.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 17.11.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 02.01.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2889292 (PEERMAN DWIGHT E); | [XD]EP0017111 (BAYER AG [DE]); | [YD]EP0032380 (BASF AG [DE]); | [YP]EP0108177 (STANDARD OIL CO [US]) |