EP0155999 - Temperature compensating mechanism for positioning of a magnetic head of a magnetic disk drive [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.11.1990 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.11.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 16.01.1991 [1991/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states International Business Machines Corporation New Orchard Road Armonk, NY 10504 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1985/40] | For all designated states International Business Machines Corporation Old Orchard Road Armonk, N.Y. 10504 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kobayashi, Masashi 3-7, Shinmei-2 Kugenuma Fujisawa-shi Kanagawa-ken / JP | 02 /
Takahashi, Keishi 16-10-203, Sakuragaoka-1 Kugenuma Fujisawa-shi Kanagawa-ken / JP | 03 /
Yoneyama, Kimiya 25-8-305, Kaigandori-5 Naka-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa-ken / JP | [1985/40] | Representative(s) | Herzog, Friedrich Joachim Birkenstrasse 77 71155 Altdorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1985/40] | Herzog, Friedrich Joachim, Dipl.-Ing. Birkenstrasse 77 D-71155 Altdorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 84114123.7 | 23.11.1984 | [1985/40] | Priority number, date | JP19840061307 | 30.03.1984 Original published format: JP 6130784 | [1985/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0155999 | Date: | 02.10.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/40] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0155999 | Date: | 30.04.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0155999 | Date: | 07.02.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/06] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.03.1986 | Classification | IPC: | G11B21/02, G11B5/55 | [1986/19] | CPC: |
G11B5/5521 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1985/40] | G11B21/02 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1985/40] | Title | German: | Temperaturkompensationsvorrichtung für die Positionierung eines Magnetkopfes eines Magnetplattenantriebs | [1985/40] | English: | Temperature compensating mechanism for positioning of a magnetic head of a magnetic disk drive | [1985/40] | French: | Dispositif de compensation en température pour positionner une tête magnétique d'une unité de disques magnétiques | [1985/40] | File destroyed: | 03.03.2001 | Examination procedure | 23.11.1984 | Examination requested [1985/40] | 18.07.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.11.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.12.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.03.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.05.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 14.08.1989 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.08.1989 | Fee for grant paid | 29.08.1989 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.11.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit [1991/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.11.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.11.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.11.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 17.11.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP54163012 ; | [A]US4164769 (BARROWS ROBERT E [US], et al); | [A]DE3202577 (HITACHI LTD [JP]) | [A] - COMPUTER DESIGN, vol. 21, no. 9, September 1982, pages 111-118, Winchester, Massachusetts, US; M. DUDSON: "Winchester technology brings more storage to microsystems" | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 5, no. 36 (P-51)[708], 7th March 1981; | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 4, no. 24 (E-173), 29th February 1980; & JP - A - 54 163 012 (MITSUBISHI) 25-12-1979, & JP54163012 A 00000000 |