EP0146032 - Method and apparatus for the conversion of a polyphase voltage system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.05.1989 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.05.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 28.06.1989 [1989/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Venturini, Marco Via S. Scorza, 15/21 I-16136 Genova / IT | For all designated states Alesina, ALberto Via Marazzani, 12 Milan / IT | [1985/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1985/26] | Representative(s) | Monti, Umberto Via Washington 48 20146 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1988/01] | Monti, Umberto Via Washington 48 I-20146 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 84114357.1 | 26.11.1984 | [1985/26] | Priority number, date | IT19830024008 | 05.12.1983 Original published format: IT 2400883 | [1985/26] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0146032 | Date: | 26.06.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/26] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0146032 | Date: | 28.08.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0146032 | Date: | 06.07.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.06.1985 | Classification | IPC: | H02M5/04, H02M5/27, H02M5/297, H02P5/34 | [1985/26] | CPC: |
H02M5/271 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1985/26] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Umwandlung einer mehrphasigen Spannung | [1985/26] | English: | Method and apparatus for the conversion of a polyphase voltage system | [1985/26] | French: | Méthode et appareil pour la conversion d'un système de voltage polyphasé | [1988/27] |
Former [1985/26] | Méthode et appareil pour la conversion d'un système de voltage polyphasique | File destroyed: | 03.03.2001 | Examination procedure | 17.02.1986 | Examination requested [1986/19] | 17.02.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.06.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.09.1987 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 17.12.1987 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.03.1988 | Fee for grant paid | 04.03.1988 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.04.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit [1989/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.11.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.10.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | US3585489 [ ] (PELLY BRIAN R, et al); | US4041368 [ ] (GRITTER DAVID JAMES); | GB2048588 [ ] (VENTURINI M); | EP0072527 [ ] (WESTINGHOUSE ELECTRIC CORP [US]); | EP0083866 [ ] (TEXAS INSTRUMENTS INC [US], et al) | Examination | EP0124302 |