EP0146070 - Record carrier scanning device for line printers [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.05.1990 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.05.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 04.07.1990 [1990/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1 DE-80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1985/26] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 D-80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Brandner, Alois, Dipl.-Ing. (FH) Arcisstrasse 39/III D-8000 München / DE | [1985/26] | Application number, filing date | 84114680.6 | 03.12.1984 | [1985/26] | Priority number, date | DE19833345030 | 13.12.1983 Original published format: DE 3345030 | [1985/26] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0146070 | Date: | 26.06.1985 | Language: | DE | [1985/26] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0146070 | Date: | 11.05.1988 | Language: | DE | [1988/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0146070 | Date: | 19.07.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.03.1988 | Classification | IPC: | B41J29/42, B65H23/032, H04N1/06 | [1988/18] | CPC: |
B41J29/42 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1985/26] | B41J29/42 | Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1985/26] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung in Zeilendruckeinrichtungen zur Abtastung des Aufzeichnungsträgers | [1985/26] | English: | Record carrier scanning device for line printers | [1985/31] | French: | Dispositif de lecture du support d'information dans les imprimantes ligne par ligne | [1985/31] | Examination procedure | 21.12.1984 | Examination requested [1985/26] | 13.12.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 24.01.1989 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.01.1989 | Fee for grant paid | 26.01.1989 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.04.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit [1990/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.12.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.12.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.12.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | DE2748266 [ ]; | US4146797 [ ] (NAKAGAWA HIROSHI) | [ ] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, Unexamined Applications, 21. September 1982, Feld M, Band 6, Nr. 184, The Patent Office Japanese Government, seite 63 M 157 * Kokai-Nr. 57-91 293 (Canon) |