EP0147688 - Method of sequentially firing electronic-delay fuses [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.07.1990 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.07.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 12.09.1990 [1990/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dynamit Nobel Aktiengesellschaft 53839 Troisdorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1988/17] | For all designated states Dynamit Nobel Aktiengesellschaft D-53839 Troisdorf / DE | ||
Former [1985/28] | For all designated states Hüls Troisdorf Aktiengesellschaft Postfach 11 65 D-5210 Troisdorf / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Florin, Johann, Dr. Robert-Koch-Strasse 3 D-5210 Troisdorf / DE | 02 /
Heinemeyer, Friedrich, Dr. Farnweg 29 D-5200 Siegburg / DE | 03 /
Röh, Peter Augustinusstrasse 2 D-5210 Troisdorf / DE | 04 /
Störrle, Hansmartin Op den Kamp 8 D-2000 Norderstedt / DE | [1985/28] | Application number, filing date | 84114810.9 | 05.12.1984 | [1985/28] | Priority number, date | DE19833346343 | 22.12.1983 Original published format: DE 3346343 | DE19843441736 | 15.11.1984 Original published format: DE 3441736 | [1985/28] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0147688 | Date: | 10.07.1985 | Language: | DE | [1985/28] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0147688 | Date: | 30.12.1986 | Language: | DE | [1986/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0147688 | Date: | 04.10.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.11.1986 | Classification | IPC: | F42D1/06 | [1985/28] | CPC: |
F42D1/055 (EP,US);
F42B3/122 (EP,US);
F42D1/04 (KR);
G05B24/00 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, SE [1985/28] | Title | German: | Verfahren zum zeitlich gestaffelten Auslösen elektronischer Sprengzeitzünder | [1985/28] | English: | Method of sequentially firing electronic-delay fuses | [1985/28] | French: | Procédé d'allumage de détonateurs à temporisation électronique, échelonné dans le temps | [1985/28] | Examination procedure | 16.04.1987 | Examination requested [1987/25] | 04.11.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.01.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.05.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.09.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.02.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 01.03.1989 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.03.1989 | Fee for grant paid | 04.03.1989 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.07.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit [1990/37] | Request for further processing for: | 08.11.1985 | Request for further processing filed | 08.11.1985 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request rejected | 25.04.1986 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.12.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.12.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.12.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]DE2945122 (ICI LTD); | [A]US4314507 (SELIGMANN PETER C) |