EP0151257 - Method for producing range coded images [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1985/33] | Apparatus and method for recording distant images | ||
[1991/28] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.05.1992 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.05.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 01.07.1992 [1992/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DORNIER GMBH Postfach 1420 88004 Friedrichshafen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1985/33] | For all designated states DORNIER GMBH Postfach 1420 D-88004 Friedrichshafen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Metzdorff, Walter, Dr. Frühlingsweg 11 D-7990 Friedrichshafen 24 / DE | 02 /
Eibert, Max, Dr. Sommerweg 3 D-7990 Friedrichshafen 24 / DE | 03 /
Lux, Peter, Dr. Untere Seestrasse 120 D-7994 Langenargen / DE | [1985/33] | Representative(s) | Landsmann, Ralf Dornier GmbH FNS 003 D-88039 Friedrichshafen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1985/33] | Landsmann, Ralf, Dipl.-Ing. Dornier GmbH FNS 003 D-88039 Friedrichshafen / DE | Application number, filing date | 84114892.7 | 07.12.1984 | [1985/33] | Priority number, date | DE19843404396 | 08.02.1984 Original published format: DE 3404396 | [1985/33] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0151257 | Date: | 14.08.1985 | Language: | DE | [1985/33] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0151257 | Date: | 29.04.1987 | Language: | DE | [1987/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0151257 | Date: | 10.07.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/28] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.03.1987 | Classification | IPC: | G01S17/88, G01S17/10 | [1985/33] | CPC: |
G01S17/89 (EP,US);
G01S17/18 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1985/33] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Erzeugung von Entfernungsbildern | [1991/28] | English: | Method for producing range coded images | [1991/28] | French: | Procédé pour la production d'images codées en distance | [1991/28] |
Former [1985/33] | Vorrichtung und Verfahren zur Aufnahme von Entfernungsbildern | ||
Former [1985/33] | Apparatus and method for recording distant images | ||
Former [1985/33] | Dispositif et procédé pour l'enregistrement de scènes éloignées | Examination procedure | 23.10.1987 | Examination requested [1987/52] | 14.11.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.03.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.11.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 15.11.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.12.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 10.01.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.03.1991 | Fee for grant paid | 26.03.1991 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 11.04.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit [1992/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.11.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.11.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.11.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.11.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.11.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]GB1262416 (STANDARD TELEPHONES CABLES LTD [GB]); | [X]US3649124 (TAKAOKA TAKASHI, et al); | [Y]US3689156 (KERPCHAR MICHAEL); | [A]US3886303 (MORRIS EDWIN E); | [Y]US4023175 (BROWN ROBIN CHARLES ARMSTRONG, et al) |