EP0146853 - Inverter driver for X-Ray generator [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 19.07.1985 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.08.2008 | Change - applicant | published on 17.09.2008 [2008/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY 1 River Road Schenectady, NY 12345 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2008/38] | For all designated states GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY 1 River Road Schenectady NY 12345 / US | ||
Former [1985/27] | For all designated states GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY 1 River Road Schenectady New York 12305 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Santurtun, Carlos Manueco Felipe Alfaro 2 Pozuelo de Alcorcon Madrid / ES | 02 /
Ceca, Felix Lopez Avda. de Aviacion 73-2 0-F Madrid 24 / ES | [1985/27] | Representative(s) | Schüler, Horst, et al Kaiserstrasse 69 D-6000 Frankfurt/Main 1 / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1985/27] | Schüler, Horst, Dr., et al Kaiserstrasse 69 D-6000 Frankfurt/Main 1 / DE | Application number, filing date | 84114921.4 | 07.12.1984 | [1985/27] | Priority number, date | US19830564612 | 22.12.1983 Original published format: US 564612 | [1985/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0146853 | Date: | 03.07.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/27] | Classification | IPC: | H02M3/337, H02M7/5387, H05G1/32 | [1985/42] | CPC: |
H02M3/3376 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1985/27] | H02M3/337 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [1985/27] | Title | German: | Wandler-Steuerschaltung für Röntgenstrahlengenerator | [1985/27] | English: | Inverter driver for X-Ray generator | [1985/27] | French: | Circuit de commande de convertisseur pour générateur de rayons X | [1985/27] | File destroyed: | 25.05.1993 | Examination procedure | 06.07.1985 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1985/38] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. |