EP0155373 - High-voltage high-power fuse [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.08.1990 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 19.09.1990 [1990/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Felten & Guilleaume Energietechnik AG Postfach 80 50 01 D-51058 Köln / DE | [1986/47] |
Former [1985/39] | For all designated states Felten & Guilleaume Energietechnik GmbH Schanzenstrasse 24-30 Postfach 80 50 01 D-5000 Köln 80 / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Mooz, Dietrich, Dipl.-Ing. Mergelskull 15 D-4150 Krefeld / DE | 02 /
Dirks, Rolf Erlenweg 18 D-4156 Willich 4 / DE | [1985/39] | Application number, filing date | 84114942.0 | 07.12.1984 | [1985/39] | Priority number, date | DE19843409957 | 17.03.1984 Original published format: DE 3409957 | [1985/39] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0155373 | Date: | 25.09.1985 | Language: | DE | [1985/39] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0155373 | Date: | 22.04.1987 | Language: | DE | [1987/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0155373 | Date: | 11.10.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.03.1987 | Classification | IPC: | H01H71/14, H01H85/30 | [1985/39] | CPC: |
H01H71/14 (EP,US);
H01H85/306 (EP,US);
H01H2085/0258 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1985/39] | Title | German: | Hochspannungs-Hochleistungs-Sicherung | [1985/39] | English: | High-voltage high-power fuse | [1985/39] | French: | Fusible de haute puissance haute tension | [1985/39] | Examination procedure | 25.05.1987 | Examination requested [1987/32] | 15.03.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 10.04.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 17.04.1989 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.07.1989 | Fee for grant paid | 17.07.1989 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.07.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit [1990/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.09.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.09.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.08.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP52076509 ; | [A]US2306153 (JOSEF BIERMANNS, et al); | [A]US2982834 (HAROLD EDMUNDS WILLIAM); | [A]BE668548 ; | [A]FR1461736 (SIEMENS AG); | [A]DE1920825 (FRITZ DRIESCHER SPEZ FABRIK FU); | [A]US3593249 (SEDGWICK ALLAN R); | [A]DE2547990 (WICKMANN WERKE AG) | [A] - PATENTS ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, Band 1, Nr. 134, 5. November 1977, Seite 4679 M 77; & JP-A-52 076 509, & JP52076509 A 00000000 |