EP0151730 - Radio frequency receiving apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.09.1986 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BROWN, BOVERI & CIE Aktiengesellschaft Kallstadter Strasse 1 68309 Mannheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1985/34] | For all designated states BROWN, BOVERI & CIE Aktiengesellschaft Kallstadter Strasse 1 D-68309 Mannheim / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Strietzel, Rainer Im Schnepfengrund 8 D-6900 Heidelberg 1 / DE | 02 /
Siedelhofer, Bernd, Dipl.-Ing. Siegfriedstrasse 30 D-6905 Schriesheim / DE | [1985/34] | Representative(s) | Kempe, Wolfgang, et al c/o Brown, Boveri & Cie AG Postfach 351 D-6800 Mannheim 1 / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1985/34] | Kempe, Wolfgang, Dr., et al c/o Brown, Boveri & Cie AG Postfach 351 D-6800 Mannheim 1 / DE | Application number, filing date | 84114949.5 | 07.12.1984 | [1985/34] | Priority number, date | DE19833347044 | 24.12.1983 Original published format: DE 3347044 | [1985/34] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0151730 | Date: | 21.08.1985 | Language: | DE | [1985/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.05.1985 | Classification | IPC: | G01S13/82, G08C17/00 | [1985/34] | CPC: |
H04B1/10 (EP);
H03D7/163 (EP);
H03B21/02 (EP);
H03B2200/0078 (EP);
H03D1/2245 (EP);
H03D9/02 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | CH, FR, GB, IT, LI, SE [1985/34] | Title | German: | Empfangseinrichtung für Funkempfänger | [1985/34] | English: | Radio frequency receiving apparatus | [1985/34] | French: | Appareil récepteur à radiofréquence | [1985/34] | File destroyed: | 14.12.1992 | Examination procedure | 22.04.1986 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1986/43] | 20.05.1986 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1986/43] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US4075632 ; | [Y]US3728721 ; | [A]US4360810 ; | [A]EP0082491 ; | [A]US4200870 |