EP0184587 - Robot operator for a computer Terminal [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.01.1991 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.01.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 13.03.1991 [1991/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states International Business Machines Corporation New Orchard Road Armonk, NY 10504 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1986/25] | For all designated states International Business Machines Corporation Old Orchard Road Armonk, N.Y. 10504 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kuiper, H. F. Mijzijde 49 3471 GP Kamerik / NL | [1986/25] | Representative(s) | Louet Feisser, Arnold, et al Intellectual Property Department IBM Nederland N.V. Watsonweg 2 1423 ND Uithoorn / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1988/33] | Louet Feisser, Arnold, et al Intellectual Property Department IBM Nederland N.V. Watsonweg 2 NL-1423 ND Uithoorn / NL | ||
Former [1986/25] | van Baarzel, Hermanus Jacobus Intellectual Property Department IBM Nederland N.V. Watsonweg 2 NL-1423 ND Uithoorn / NL | Application number, filing date | 84115017.0 | 11.12.1984 | [1986/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0184587 | Date: | 18.06.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0184587 | Date: | 28.03.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.09.1985 | Classification | IPC: | G06F3/02 | [1986/25] | CPC: |
G06F3/0489 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [1986/25] | Title | German: | Roboter-Bediener für ein Rechnerterminal | [1986/25] | English: | Robot operator for a computer Terminal | [1986/25] | French: | Opérateur robotique pour terminal d'ordinateur | [1986/25] | File destroyed: | 15.01.2000 | Examination procedure | 29.10.1986 | Examination requested [1986/52] | 13.07.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.11.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.06.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 26.09.1989 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.10.1989 | Fee for grant paid | 06.10.1989 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.12.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit [1991/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.12.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.12.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.11.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.12.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JP56162123 ; | [A]JP58203565 ; | [Y]US4272813 ; | [Y]US4088981 ; | [A]US4377852 ; | [A]EP0111130 ; | [A]GB1116450 | [Y] - PATENTS ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 6, no. 46 (P-107)[924], 24th March 1982; & JP - A - 56 162 123 (HITACHI SEISAKUSHO K.K.) 12-12-1981, & JP56162123 A 00000000 | [A] - IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN, vol. 23, no. 9, February 1981, page 4006, Armonk, US; C.H. SEDERHOLM et al.: "Intelligent telephone" | [A] - PATENTS ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 8, no. 55 (P-260)[1492], 13th March 1984; & JP - A - 58 203 565 (HITACHI SEISAKUSHO K.K.) 28-11-1983, & JP58203565 A 00000000 |