EP0146866 - Phenylsulfonephthaleinyl-beta-D-galactosides, methods for their preparation and their use in the determination of beta-D-galactosidase [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.04.1992 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.04.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 10.06.1992 [1992/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Roche Diagnostics GmbH Sandhofer Strasse 116 68305 Mannheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1985/27] | For all designated states BOEHRINGER MANNHEIM GMBH D-68298 Mannheim / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kuhr, Manfred, Dr. rer. nat. Werthmannweg 23 D-6800 Mannheim 31 / DE | 02 /
Machat, Rudolf, Dr. rer. nat. dipl. chem. Bassermannstrasse 65 D-6800 Mannheim 1 / DE | 03 /
Weckerle, Wolfgang, Dr. rer. nat. Auf dem Leimen 12 D-6718 Grünstadt / DE | 04 /
Batz, Hans-Georg, Dr. rer. nat. Traubinger Strasse 63 D-8132 Tutzing / DE | 05 /
Herrmann, Rupert, Dr. rer. nat. Heinrichstrasse 3 D-8120 Weilheim / DE | 06 /
Kleemann, Wolfgang, Dr. Ph. D. Alpspitzstrasse 7 D-8132 Tutzing / DE | 07 /
Buschek, Herbert Paradeisstrasse 36 D-8120 Weilheim / DE | [1985/27] | Application number, filing date | 84115131.9 | 11.12.1984 | [1985/27] | Priority number, date | DE19833345748 | 17.12.1983 Original published format: DE 3345748 | [1985/27] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0146866 | Date: | 03.07.1985 | Language: | DE | [1985/27] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0146866 | Date: | 13.05.1987 | Language: | DE | [1987/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0146866 | Date: | 19.06.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.03.1987 | Classification | IPC: | C07H15/20, C12Q1/34 | [1985/27] | CPC: |
C07H15/203 (EP,US);
C12Q1/34 (EP,US);
C12Q2334/40 (EP,US);
G01N2333/924 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1985/27] | Title | German: | Phenolsulfonphtaleinyl-Beta-D-galactoside, Verfahren zu deren Herstellung sowie deren Verwendung zur Bestimmung der Beta-D-Galactosidase | [1985/27] | English: | Phenylsulfonephthaleinyl-beta-D-galactosides, methods for their preparation and their use in the determination of beta-D-galactosidase | [1985/27] | French: | Phénylsulphonphtaleinyl-bêta-D-galactosides, leur méthode de préparation et leur emploi pour la détermination de la bêta-D-galactosidase | [1985/27] | Examination procedure | 11.12.1984 | Examination requested [1985/27] | 15.04.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.08.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.11.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M07) | 03.06.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.09.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.02.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.02.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 21.04.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.08.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 23.11.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.02.1991 | Fee for grant paid | 06.02.1991 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.03.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit [1992/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.12.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.12.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.12.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.11.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 05.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JP51114990 ; | [X]EP0060793 (SHIONOGI & CO [JP]); | [X]EP0122023 (E Y LAB INC [US]) | [X] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Band 86, Nr. 17, 25. April 1977, Seite 189, Zusammenfassung Nr. 116822z, Columbus, Ohio, US; & JP-A-51 114 990 (ALZA CORP.) 09-10-1976, & JP51114990 A 00000000 | Examination | EP0294804 |