EP0179949 - Complementory device for a balloon [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.05.1987 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.06.2008 | Change - representative | published on 09.07.2008 [2008/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Neumeier, Robert Weissachaustrasse 21 D-8183 Rottach-Egern / DE | [1986/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1986/19] | Representative(s) | Viering, Jentschura & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Grillparzerstrasse 14 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/28] | Viering, Jentschura & Partner Postfach 22 14 43 80504 München / DE | ||
Former [1986/19] | Patentanwälte Viering, Jentschura & Partner Postfach 22 14 43 D-80504 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 84115308.3 | 12.12.1984 | [1986/19] | Priority number, date | DE19843439524 | 29.10.1984 Original published format: DE 3439524 | DE19843439525 | 29.10.1984 Original published format: DE 3439525 | DE19843439728 | 30.10.1984 Original published format: DE 3439728 | DE19843440309 | 05.11.1984 Original published format: DE 3440309 | DE19843442242 | 19.11.1984 Original published format: DE 3442242 | DE19843444674 | 07.12.1984 Original published format: DE 3444674 | [1986/19] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0179949 | Date: | 07.05.1986 | Language: | DE | [1986/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.08.1985 | Classification | IPC: | A63H27/10, G09F21/10 | [1986/19] | CPC: |
F21V3/023 (EP);
A63H27/10 (EP);
G09F21/10 (EP);
A63H2027/1008 (EP);
A63H2027/1041 (EP);
A63H2027/1058 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1986/19] | Title | German: | Ballon-Zusatzvorrichtung | [1986/19] | English: | Complementory device for a balloon | [1986/19] | French: | Accessoire complémentaire pour ballon | [1986/19] | File destroyed: | 24.05.1993 | Examination procedure | 08.01.1987 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1987/29] | 09.02.1987 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1987/29] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 07.11.1986 | M02   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.1986 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YD]DE3015962 ; | [Y]GB2057663 ; | [A]DE2356485 ; | [A]US3355627 ; | [A]US2383390 (JACOBS HERBERT E); | [A]FR2417058 ; | [A]US2542361 ; | [A]FR2117772 ; | [A]US1820681 ; | [A]US3836761 |