EP0184595 - Process for the synthesis of N-alkylphthalimide [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 02.08.1988 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.08.2008 | Change - applicant | published on 17.09.2008 [2008/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY 1 River Road Schenectady, NY 12345 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2008/38] | For all designated states GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY 1 River Road Schenectady NY 12345 / US | ||
Former [1986/25] | For all designated states GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY 1 River Road Schenectady New York 12305 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Cawse, James Norman 132 Kittredge Road Pittsfield Massachusetts 01201 / US | [1986/25] | Representative(s) | Schüler, Horst, et al Luderschmidt, Schüler & Partner GbR Postfach 3929 65029 Wiesbaden / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1986/25] | Schüler, Horst, Dr., et al Patentanwalt, Kaiserstrasse 69 D-60329 Frankfurt / DE | Application number, filing date | 84115454.5 | 14.12.1984 | [1986/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0184595 | Date: | 18.06.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.10.1985 | Classification | IPC: | C07D209/48 | [1986/25] | CPC: |
C07D209/48 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1986/25] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von N-Alkylphthalimid | [1986/25] | English: | Process for the synthesis of N-alkylphthalimide | [1986/25] | French: | Procédé de préparation de N-alkylphtalimide | [1986/25] | File destroyed: | 05.08.1994 | Examination procedure | 08.12.1986 | Examination requested [1987/06] | 21.04.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.07.1988 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1988/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.11.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.12.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB1484243 ; | [AD]DE2628783 ; | [A]DE2412466 | [A] - "Methoden der organischen Chemie" (Houben-Weyl), 4th edition, vol. XI/2, Georg Thieme Verlag, Stuttgart, DE, 1958, pages 16-19, F. MÖLLER: "Umwandlung von primären und sekundären Aminen" | [AD] - JOURNAL OF THE CHEMICAL SOCIETY, 1945, pages 625-628, The Chemical Society, London, GB; F.S. SPRING et al.: "The application of the Hofmann reaction to the synthesis of heterocyclic compounds. Part III. Synthesis of 3-alkyl-2 : 4-diketo-1 : 2 : 3 : 4-tetrahydro-quinazolines from N-alkylphthalamides" |