EP0148453 - Flexible stabilizer for degraded heat exchanger tubing [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.06.1991 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.06.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 07.08.1991 [1991/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states WESTINGHOUSE ELECTRIC CORPORATION Westinghouse Building Gateway Center Pittsburgh Pennsylvania 15235 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1985/29] | For all designated states WESTINGHOUSE ELECTRIC CORPORATION Westinghouse Building Gateway Center Pittsburgh Pennsylvania 15235 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Cooper, Frank William, Jr. 115 Himalaya Road Monroeville Pennsylvania 15146 / US | 02 /
Epperson, Thomas Marion 4 Stonehaven Drive, RD 11 Irwin Pennsylvania 15642 / US | 03 /
Calhoun, Gregory Lee 457 Markle Road Apollo Pennsylvania 15613 / US | 04 /
Kucherer, Harvey David 1321 Foxwood Drive Monroeville Pennsylvania 15146 / US | [1985/29] | Representative(s) | Patentanwälte Dipl.-Ing. R. Holzer, Dipl.-Ing. (FH) W. Gallo Ludwigstrasse 26 D-86152 Augsburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1985/29] | Patentanwälte Dipl.-Ing. R. Holzer Dipl.-Ing. (FH) W. Gallo Ludwigstrasse 26 D-86152 Augsburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 84115487.5 | 14.12.1984 | [1985/29] | Priority number, date | US19840569078 | 09.01.1984 Original published format: US 569078 | [1985/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0148453 | Date: | 17.07.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/29] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0148453 | Date: | 21.05.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0148453 | Date: | 16.08.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.04.1986 | Classification | IPC: | F22B37/00, F28F11/00 | [1985/29] | CPC: |
F22B37/18 (EP,US);
F22B37/00 (KR);
Y10S122/14 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, SE [1985/29] | Title | German: | Flexibler Stabilisator für schadhafte Wärmetauscherrohre | [1990/33] | English: | Flexible stabilizer for degraded heat exchanger tubing | [1985/29] | French: | Stabilisateur flexible pour tubes dégradés d'échangeur de chaleur | [1985/29] |
Former [1985/29] | Flexibler Stabilisator für degradierte Wärmetauscherrohre | Examination procedure | 20.10.1986 | Examination requested [1986/51] | 24.09.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M05) | 03.03.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.05.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M05) | 14.10.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.01.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.06.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.09.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 23.01.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 29.01.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.03.1990 | Fee for grant paid | 16.03.1990 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.05.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit [1991/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.12.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.12.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.12.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.12.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE158565 ; | [A]FR9279E (JACQUES ROBERT [DZ]); | [A]GB191310136 (HOUSTON ROBERT); | [A]US1590812 (DOBLE JOHN A); | [A]US1606739 (AVERILL EARL A); | [A]EP0037243 (LAWS WILLIAM ROBERT [GB], et al); | [A]FR2514099 (WESTINGHOUSE ELECTRIC CORP [US]) |