EP0159405 - Process for the manufacture of a fibre-containing composite article [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.07.1988 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.07.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 24.08.1988 [1988/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Vacuumschmelze GmbH Grüner Weg 37 63450 Hanau / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1985/44] | For all designated states VACUUMSCHMELZE GMBH Grüner Weg 37 Postfach 2253 D-63412 Hanau / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hillmann, Hans, Dr. Würzburger Strasse 55 D-6458 Rodenbach / DE | [1985/44] | Application number, filing date | 84115810.8 | 19.12.1984 | [1985/44] | Priority number, date | DE19843412837 | 05.04.1984 Original published format: DE 3412837 | [1985/44] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0159405 | Date: | 30.10.1985 | Language: | DE | [1985/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0159405 | Date: | 02.09.1987 | Language: | DE | [1987/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.08.1985 | Classification | IPC: | H01L39/24, C22C1/09 | [1985/44] | CPC: |
C22C47/064 (EP);
C22C47/062 (EP);
C22C47/20 (EP);
H10N60/0128 (EP);
H10N60/0184 (EP);
B22F2998/00 (EP);
| C-Set: |
B22F2998/00, C22C47/064 (EP);
B22F2998/10, B22F3/1258, B22F3/15, B22F5/10 (EP);
B22F2999/00, B22F3/1216, C22C9/00, B22F2201/20 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, LI, NL [1985/44] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung eines Filamente enthaltenden Verbundkörpers | [1985/44] | English: | Process for the manufacture of a fibre-containing composite article | [1985/44] | French: | Procédé pour la fabrication d'un corps composite contenant des filaments | [1985/44] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 27.12.1984 | Examination requested [1985/44] | 12.12.1986 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 14.01.1987 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.03.1987 | Fee for grant paid | 17.03.1987 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.06.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit [1988/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.12.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB1178117 (IMP METAL IND KYNOCH LTD [GB]); | [A]GB2003766 (AIRCO INC); | [A]GB2050878 (TELEDYNE IND) |