EP0151299 - Aromatic polyester, process for production thereof and film, fiber and other shaped articles therefrom [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.09.1988 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.09.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 09.11.1988 [1988/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TEIJIN LIMITED 11, Minamihonmachi 1-chome Higashi-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 541 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1985/33] | For all designated states TEIJIN LIMITED 11, Minamihonmachi 1-chome Higashi-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 541 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Inata, Hiroo 6-49-5, Hirata, Iwakuni-shi Yamaguchi-ken / JP | 02 /
Umetani, Hiroyuki 2-9-2, Yamate-cho, Iwakuni-shi Yamaguchi-ken / JP | 03 /
Matsumura, Shunichi 1-28-4, Ozu-cho, Iwakuni-shi Yamaguchi-ken / JP | [1985/33] | Representative(s) | Kraus, Walter, et al Patentanwälte Kraus, Weisert & Partner Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 80539 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1985/45] | Kraus, Walter, Dr., et al Patentanwälte Kraus, Weisert & Partner Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 D-80539 München / DE | ||
Former [1985/33] | Kraus, Walter, Dr. Patentanwälte Kraus Weisert & Partner Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 D-80539 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 84115854.6 | 19.12.1984 | [1985/33] | Priority number, date | JP19830242098 | 23.12.1983 Original published format: JP 24209883 | JP19840075777 | 17.04.1984 Original published format: JP 7577784 | [1985/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0151299 | Date: | 14.08.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/33] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0151299 | Date: | 30.10.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0151299 | Date: | 19.11.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.08.1985 | Classification | IPC: | C08G63/66, C08G63/18, C08G63/60 | [1985/33] | CPC: |
C08G63/672 (EP);
C08G63/6886 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [1985/33] | Title | German: | Aromatischer Polyester, Verfahren zur Herstellung und Film, Faser und andere geformte Gegenstände daraus | [1985/33] | English: | Aromatic polyester, process for production thereof and film, fiber and other shaped articles therefrom | [1985/33] | French: | Polyester aromatique, procédé pour sa production, et film, fibre et autres articles formés à partir de ce polyester | [1985/33] | File destroyed: | 03.03.2001 | Examination procedure | 28.02.1986 | Examination requested [1986/19] | 06.02.1987 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 19.05.1987 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.07.1987 | Fee for grant paid | 28.07.1987 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.08.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit [1988/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.12.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0017310 |