EP0157944 - Pressure control valve for fluid-operated brake installations [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 10.09.1991 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.09.1991 | Revocation of patent | published on 30.10.1991 [1991/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ROBERT BOSCH GMBH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1985/42] | For all designated states ROBERT BOSCH GMBH Postfach 30 02 20 D-70442 Stuttgart / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Domann, Helmut, Ing. Lohlenbachweg 3A D-7250 Leonberg / DE | 02 /
Grauel, Ingolf, Dipl.-Ing. Lessingstrasse 6 D-7143 Vaihingen/Enz / DE | 03 /
Müller, Egbert, Dr.-Ing. Schillerstrasse 12 D-7147 Hochdorf / DE | 04 /
Stumpe, Werner, Ing. Goerdelerstrasse 10 D-7014 Kornwestheim / DE | [1985/42] | Application number, filing date | 84116239.9 | 22.12.1984 | [1985/42] | Priority number, date | DE19843413735 | 12.04.1984 Original published format: DE 3413735 | [1985/42] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0157944 | Date: | 16.10.1985 | Language: | DE | [1985/42] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0157944 | Date: | 22.10.1986 | Language: | DE | [1986/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0157944 | Date: | 02.11.1988 | Language: | DE | [1988/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.09.1986 | Classification | IPC: | B60T13/68 | [1985/42] | CPC: |
B60T8/367 (EP);
B60T13/683 (EP);
B60T8/1766 (EP);
B60T8/266 (EP);
B60T8/361 (EP);
B60T8/3675 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL, SE [1985/42] | Title | German: | Drucksteuerventil für druckmittelbetätigte Bremsanlagen | [1985/42] | English: | Pressure control valve for fluid-operated brake installations | [1985/42] | French: | Valve de commande de pression pour installations de freinage actionnées par fluide | [1985/42] | Examination procedure | 22.12.1984 | Examination requested [1985/42] | 12.04.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 27.04.1988 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.06.1988 | Fee for grant paid | 16.06.1988 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
17.05.1989
22.06.1989
ADMISSIBLE Graubremse GmbH Eppelheimer Strasse 76 D-6900 Heidelberg / DE Opponent's representative Rehberg, Elmar Rehberg Hüppe + Partner Postfach 31 62 37021 Göttingen / DE | 02
07.07.1989
01.08.1989
ADMISSIBLE WABCO Westinghouse Fahrzeugbremsen GmbH Am Lindener Hafen 21 Postfach D-30432 Hannover / DE Opponent's representative Schrödter, Manfred WABCO GmbH Postfach 91 12 62 30432 Hannover / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1989/36] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
17.05.1989
22.06.1989
ADMISSIBLE Graubremse GmbH Eppelheimer Strasse 76 D-6900 Heidelberg / DE Opponent's representative Rehberg, Elmar, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwalt Postfach 31 62 D-37021 Göttingen / DE | ||
02
07.07.1989
01.08.1989
ADMISSIBLE WABCO Westinghouse Fahrzeugbremsen GmbH Am Lindener Hafen 21 Postfach D-30432 Hannover / DE Opponent's representative Schrödter, Manfred, Dipl.-Ing. WABCO Westinghouse Fahrzeugbremsen GmbH Postfach 91 12 80 D-30432 Hannover / DE | |||
Former [1989/28] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
17.05.1989
22.06.1989
ADMISSIBLE Graubremse GmbH Eppelheimer Strasse 76 D-6900 Heidelberg / DE Opponent's representative Rehberg, Elmar, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwalt Postfach 31 62 D-37021 Göttingen / DE | 13.09.1989 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 30.11.1989 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 15.12.1989 | Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M02) | 26.03.1990 | Reply of parties involved to observations of patent proprietor | 15.01.1991 | Date of oral proceedings | 15.01.1991 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [1991/44] | 31.05.1991 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 31.05.1991 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.12.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.12.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE1888850U (HOETTEN HEINZ [DE]); | [A]DE2247273 |