EP0147863 - Surface acoustic wave transducer [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.04.1992 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.04.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 27.05.1992 [1992/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kabushiki Kaisha Toshiba 72, Horikawa-cho, Saiwai-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa-ken 210-8572 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1985/28] | For all designated states KABUSHIKI KAISHA TOSHIBA 72, Horikawa-cho, Saiwai-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa-ken 210, Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kodama, Toshikazu B-606 Ofana-Park-Town 510, Kasama-cho Totsuka-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa-ken / JP | 02 /
Sato, Koji Maruyama-so 2F 1-25-4, Shimosueyoshi Tsurumi-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa-ken / JP | [1991/23] |
Former [1985/28] | 01 /
Kodama, Foshikazu B-606 Ofana-Park-Town 510, Kasama-cho Totsuka-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa-ken / JP | ||
02 /
Sato, Koji Maruyama-so 2F 1-25-4, Shimosueyoshi Tsurumi-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa-ken / JP | Representative(s) | Lehn, Werner, et al Hoffmann Eitle, Patent- und Rechtsanwälte, Postfach 81 04 20 81904 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1985/28] | Lehn, Werner, Dipl.-Ing., et al Hoffmann, Eitle & Partner, Patentanwälte, Postfach 81 04 20 D-81904 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 84116420.5 | 28.12.1984 | [1985/28] | Priority number, date | JP19830245160 | 28.12.1983 Original published format: JP 24516083 | [1985/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0147863 | Date: | 10.07.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/28] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0147863 | Date: | 28.01.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0147863 | Date: | 05.06.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.12.1986 | Classification | IPC: | H03H9/145 | [1985/28] | CPC: |
H03H9/14505 (EP,US);
H03H9/14544 (EP,US);
H03H9/14547 (EP,US);
H03H9/1452 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1985/28] | Title | German: | Akustischer Oberflächenwellenwandler | [1985/28] | English: | Surface acoustic wave transducer | [1985/28] | French: | Transducteur à ondes acoustiques de surface | [1985/28] | Examination procedure | 28.12.1984 | Examination requested [1985/28] | 24.04.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.10.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.11.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 31.05.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.07.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 03.12.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.02.1991 | Fee for grant paid | 07.02.1991 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.03.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit [1992/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.12.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.12.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.12.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.12.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 11.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JP56010724 ; | [A]US4162465 (HANMA KENTARO [JP], et al); | [XD]JPS5884517 (TOKYO SHIBAURA ELECTRIC CO); | [L]US4535265 (KODAMA TOSHIKAZU [JP], et al) | [X] - PATENTS ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 5, no. 59 (E-53)[731], April 22, 1981; & JP 56010724 A (TOKYO SHIBAURA DENKI K.K.) 03.02.1981, & JP56010724 A 00000000 |