EP0115883 - Method of controlling the access to a TDM communication channel [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.03.1990 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.03.1997 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 23.04.1997 [1997/17] | Applicant(s) | For:DE
Philips Corporate Intellectual Property GmbH Habsburgerallee 11 52064 Aachen / DE | For:FR
GB
NL
SE
Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1984/33] | For:DE
Philips Patentverwaltung GmbH Röntgenstrasse 24 D-22335 Hamburg / DE | ||
For:FR
GB
NL
SE
Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 NL-5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Killat, Ulrich Achter Lüthmoor 2c D-2000 Hamburg 56 / DE | 02 /
Renelt, Gerhard Wiebischenkamp 41 D-2000 Hamburg 54 / DE | 03 /
Riekmann, Dieter Halstenbeker Strasse 4 D-2080 Pinneberg / DE | 04 /
Stecher, Rolf Woyrschweg 26 D-2000 Hamburg 50 / DE | [1984/33] | Representative(s) | Poddig, Dieter, et al Philips Corporate Intellectual Property GmbH, Habsburgerallee 11 52064 Aachen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1984/33] | Poddig, Dieter, Dipl.-Ing., et al Philips Patentverwaltung GmbH, Röntgenstrasse 24 D-22335 Hamburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 84200019.2 | 09.01.1984 | [1984/33] | Priority number, date | DE19833300531 | 10.01.1983 Original published format: DE 3300531 | DE19833337289 | 13.10.1983 Original published format: DE 3337289 | [1984/33] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0115883 | Date: | 15.08.1984 | Language: | DE | [1984/33] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0115883 | Date: | 02.01.1986 | Language: | DE | [1986/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0115883 | Date: | 03.05.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.10.1985 | Classification | IPC: | H04L11/16, H04Q11/04, H04J3/16 | [1984/33] | CPC: |
H04L12/64 (EP,US);
H04L12/28 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL, SE [1984/33] | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Steuern des Zugriffs auf einen Zeitmultiplex-Nachrichtenübertragungsweg | [1984/33] | English: | Method of controlling the access to a TDM communication channel | [1984/33] | French: | Méthode pour commander l'accès sur une voie de communication par multiplexage dans le temps | [1984/33] | Examination procedure | 29.05.1986 | Examination requested [1986/34] | 30.06.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 26.10.1988 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.01.1989 | Fee for grant paid | 27.01.1989 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.02.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit [1990/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.01.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.01.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.01.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.01.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0003849 (MITRE CORP [US]) | [A] - PROCEEDINGS 1982 INTERNATIONAL SYMPOSIUM ON SUBSCRIBER LOOPS AND SERVICES, 20.-24. September 1982, Seiten 35-39, IEEE, New York, US; R. RENOULIN: "An integrated service local network for distributed access of heterogeneous terminals made for firm management the project carthage" | [A] - THE INTERNATIONAL SYMPOSIUM ON SUBSCRIBER LOOPS AND SERVICES, 1978, Seiten 156-160, IEEE, New York, US; T.J. PEDERSEN: "An integrated digital subscriber multiplexing and switching system for mixed circuit and packet communication" | [A] - PROCEEDINGS OF THE IEEE 1981 NATIONAL AEROSPACE AND ELECTRONICS CONFERENCE, Band 1, 1981, Seiten 309-317, IEEE, New York, US; S.J. LARIMER et al.: "A solution to bus contention in a system of autonomous microprocessors" |