EP0115890 - Packing container with fold-out pouring spout [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.03.1989 Database last updated on 27.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.11.1999 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 29.12.1999 [1999/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AB Tetra Pak Box 61 221 00 Lund / SE | [N/P] |
Former [1987/37] | For all designated states AB TETRA PAK Box 61 S-221 00 Lund / SE | ||
Former [1984/33] | For all designated states TETRA PAK INTERNATIONAL AB Fack 1701 S-221 01 Lund 1 / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lindsjö, Ulf Jörli Mikael Stora Tvärgatan 6 S-223 53 Lund / SE | [1984/33] | Representative(s) | Bentz, Bengt Christer AB Tetra Pak Ruben Rausings gata 221 86 Lund / SE | [N/P] |
Former [1984/33] | Bentz, Bengt Christer AB Tetra Pak Ruben Rausings gata S-221 86 Lund / SE | Application number, filing date | 84200095.2 | 25.01.1984 | [1984/33] | Priority number, date | SE19830000591 | 04.02.1983 Original published format: SE 8300591 | [1984/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0115890 | Date: | 15.08.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/33] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0115890 | Date: | 11.09.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0115890 | Date: | 04.05.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.07.1985 | Classification | IPC: | B65D5/74, B65D5/06 | [1984/33] | CPC: |
B65D5/065 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1984/33] | Title | German: | Verpackung mit entfaltbarem Ausguss | [1984/33] | English: | Packing container with fold-out pouring spout | [1984/33] | French: | Emballage à goulotte dépliable | [1984/33] | Examination procedure | 04.03.1986 | Examination requested [1986/19] | 02.10.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.01.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.07.1987 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 04.11.1987 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.01.1988 | Fee for grant paid | 14.01.1988 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.02.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit [1989/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.12.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.04.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.12.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 02.02.1987 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   06.04.1987 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | LU | 31.01.1989 | [1999/52] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4027455 (RAUSING RUBEN, et al); | [A]GB2000106 (TETRA PAK INT); | [A]EP0014272 (TETRA PAK INT [SE]) |