EP0120540 - Electrical component comprising an electric circuit element having leads which are centered with respect to the walls of a housing [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.06.1988 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.03.1997 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 23.04.1997 [1997/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1984/40] | For all designated states Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 NL-5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Maijers, Andries Cornelis c/o INT. OCTROOIBUREAU B.V. Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | 02 /
Vos, Jan c/o INT. OCTROOIBUREAU B.V. Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | [1984/40] | Representative(s) | Koppen, Jan, et al INTERNATIONAAL OCTROOIBUREAU B.V., Prof. Holstlaan 6 5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1984/40] | Koppen, Jan, et al INTERNATIONAAL OCTROOIBUREAU B.V., Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | Application number, filing date | 84200406.1 | 21.03.1984 | [1984/40] | Priority number, date | NL19830001046 | 24.03.1983 Original published format: NL 8301046 | [1984/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0120540 | Date: | 03.10.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0120540 | Date: | 05.08.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.08.1984 | Classification | IPC: | H01G1/02, H01G9/06 | [1984/40] | CPC: |
H01G2/106 (EP,US);
H01C1/028 (EP,US);
H05K5/0091 (EP,US);
Y10T29/435 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49172 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1984/40] | Title | German: | Elektrisches Bauelement mit einem elektrischen Schaltungselement dessen Stromzuführdrähte bezüglich der Wände eines Gehäuses zentriert sind | [1984/40] | English: | Electrical component comprising an electric circuit element having leads which are centered with respect to the walls of a housing | [1984/40] | French: | Composant électrique comportant un élément de circuit électrique dont les fils sont centrés par rapport aux parois d'un boîtier | [1984/40] | Examination procedure | 20.11.1984 | Examination requested [1985/14] | 14.05.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.07.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.10.1986 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 02.02.1987 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.03.1987 | Fee for grant paid | 30.03.1987 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.05.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit [1988/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.03.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.03.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]FR2110871 (INT STANDARD ELECTRIC CORP); | [A]EP0062167 (SIEMENS AG [DE]); | [A]DE3130837 (ROEDERSTEIN KONDENSATOREN [DE]); | [A]DE3112833 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) | Examination | DE2048454 |