EP0128598 - Thermoplastic moulding composition [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.03.1988 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.03.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 04.05.1988 [1988/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Shell Internationale Research Maatschappij B.V. Carel van Bylandtlaan 30 2596 HR Den Haag / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1984/51] | For all designated states SHELL INTERNATIONALE RESEARCH MAATSCHAPPIJ B.V. Carel van Bylandtlaan 30 NL-2596 HR Den Haag / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Durbin, Daniel Paul 807 Palm Grove Circle Sugarland, TX 77478 / US | 02 /
Lutz, Robert Gardiner 8322 Twining Oaks Spring, TX 77379 / US | 03 /
Danforth, Richard Louis 2306 Wallingford Drive Missouri City, TX 77459 / US | [1987/20] |
Former [1984/51] | 01 /
Durbin, Daniel Paul 807 Palm Grove Circle Sugarland Texas 77478 / US | ||
02 /
Lutz, Robert Gardiner 8322 Twining Oaks Spring Texas 77379 / US | |||
03 /
Danforth, Richard Louis 2306 Wallingford Drive Missouri City Texas 77459 / US | Representative(s) | Aalbers, Onno, et al P.O. Box 162 2501 AN Den Haag / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1985/27] | Aalbers, Onno, et al P.O. Box 162 NL-2501 AN The Hague / NL | ||
Former [1984/51] | Puister, Antonius Tonnis, Mr. P.O. Box 302 NL-2501 CH The Hague / NL | Application number, filing date | 84200613.2 | 02.05.1984 | [1984/51] | Priority number, date | US19830502407 | 08.06.1983 Original published format: US 502407 | [1984/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0128598 | Date: | 19.12.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0128598 | Date: | 13.05.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.10.1984 | Classification | IPC: | C08L53/02, C08L35/06, C08L67/02, // (C08L53/02, 35:06, 67:02),(C08L35/06, 53:02, 67:02),(C08L67/02, 35:06, 67:02) | [1984/51] | CPC: |
C08L53/025 (EP,US);
C08L35/06 (EP,US);
C08L67/02 (EP,US);
C08L67/04 (EP,US);
C08L53/02 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C08L35/06, C08L2666/02 (US,EP);
C08L53/025, C08L2666/02 (US,EP);
C08L67/00, C08L35/06, C08L53/02 (EP,US);
C08L67/02, C08L2666/02 (US,EP); | Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1984/51] | Title | German: | Zusammensetzung von thermoplastischen Formmassen | [1984/51] | English: | Thermoplastic moulding composition | [1984/51] | French: | Composition de moulage thermoplastique | [1984/51] | Examination procedure | 02.05.1984 | Examination requested [1984/51] | 30.07.1986 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 14.11.1986 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.12.1986 | Fee for grant paid | 16.12.1986 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.02.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit [1988/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.03.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.03.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4377647 (DURBIN DANIEL P, et al) |