EP0127225 - Vehicle structure and assembling method therefor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.09.1988 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.09.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 09.11.1988 [1988/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states RENAULT ITALIA S.p.A. Via Tiburtina, 1159 00156 Rome / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1987/18] | For all designated states RENAULT ITALIA S.p.A. Via Tiburtina, 1159 I-00156 Rome / IT | ||
Former [1984/49] | For all designated states CLAMA s.r.l. Corso Re Umberto 84 I-10128 Torino / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gandini, Marcello Via Rosta 40 I-10090 Villarbasse Torino / IT | [1984/49] | Representative(s) | de Simone, Domenico, et al Ing. Barzanò & Zanardo Roma S.p.A. Via Piemonte 26 00187 Roma / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1987/18] | de Simone, Domenico, et al Ing. Barzanò & Zanardo Roma S.p.A. Via Piemonte 26 I-00187 Roma / IT | ||
Former [1984/49] | Patrito, Pier Franco, Dr. Ing. Cabinet PATRITO BREVETTI Via Don Minzoni 14 I-10121 Torino / IT | Application number, filing date | 84200690.0 | 15.05.1984 | [1984/49] | Priority number, date | IT19830067578 | 25.05.1983 Original published format: IT 6757883 | [1984/49] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0127225 | Date: | 05.12.1984 | Language: | FR | [1984/49] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0127225 | Date: | 22.05.1985 | Language: | FR | [1985/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0127225 | Date: | 19.11.1987 | Language: | FR | [1987/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.03.1985 | Classification | IPC: | B62D27/06 | [1984/49] | CPC: |
B62D65/04 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, LI, NL, SE [1984/49] | Title | German: | Aufbau eines Kraftfahrzeuges und Verfahren zu seinem Zusammenbau | [1984/49] | English: | Vehicle structure and assembling method therefor | [1984/49] | French: | Structure de véhicule automobile et procédé pour son assemblage | [1984/49] | Examination procedure | 12.11.1985 | Examination requested [1986/08] | 16.05.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.09.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.01.1987 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 12.05.1987 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.07.1987 | Fee for grant paid | 23.07.1987 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.08.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit [1988/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.03.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.05.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR54422E (ANCIENS ETABLISSEMENTS PANHARD); | [X]US2678231 (BELA BARENYI); | [X]FR1565920 ; | [A]FR2384666 (DEBRECZENY GEORGES [FR]) |