EP0132890 - Filleting apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Opposition rejected Status updated on 12.06.1990 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.06.1990 | Opposition rejected | published on 01.08.1990 [1990/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SYSTEMATE HOLLAND B.V. Burgemeester de Zeeuwstraat 52 NL-3281 AK Numansdorp / NL | [1985/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hazenbroek, Jacobus Eliza Burg. de Zeeuwstraat 52 NL-3281 AK Numansdorp / NL | [1985/07] | Representative(s) | Kooy, Leendert Willem, et al OCTROOIBUREAU VRIESENDORP & GAADE P.O. Box 266 2501 AW Den Haag / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1985/07] | Kooy, Leendert Willem, et al OCTROOIBUREAU VRIESENDORP & GAADE P.O. Box 266 NL-2501 AW The Hague / NL | Application number, filing date | 84201055.5 | 13.07.1984 | [1985/07] | Priority number, date | NL19830002494 | 13.07.1983 Original published format: NL 8302494 | [1985/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0132890 | Date: | 13.02.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0132890 | Date: | 14.10.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.11.1984 | Classification | IPC: | A22C21/00 | [1985/07] | CPC: |
A22C21/003 (EP,US);
A22C21/0069 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1985/07] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum Filetieren | [1987/42] | English: | Filleting apparatus | [1985/07] | French: | Dispositif pour détacher des filets de volailles | [1987/42] |
Former [1985/07] | Vorrichtung zum Filettieren | ||
Former [1985/07] | Dispositif pour fileter | Examination procedure | 06.08.1985 | Examination requested [1985/43] | 04.06.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.09.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.01.1987 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 18.03.1987 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.06.1987 | Fee for grant paid | 17.06.1987 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
11.07.1988
05.08.1988
ADMISSIBLE STORK PMT B.V. Handelstraat 3 5831 AV BOXMEER / NL Opponent's representative Timmers, Cornelis Herman Johannes Exter Polak & Charlouis B.V. (EP&C) P.O. Box 3241 2280 GE Rijswijk / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1988/36] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
11.07.1988
05.08.1988
ADMISSIBLE STORK PMT B.V. Handelstraat 3 5831 AV BOXMEER / NL Opponent's representative Timmers, Cornelis Herman Johannes, Ir. van Exter Polak & Charlouis B.V., P.O. Box 3241 NL-2280 GE Rijswijk / NL | 16.09.1988 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 16.12.1988 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 10.01.1989 | Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M04) | 11.04.1989 | Reply of parties involved to observations of patent proprietor | 11.12.1989 | Date of oral proceedings | 14.02.1990 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 14.02.1990 | Date of despatch of rejection of opposition | 24.02.1990 | Legal effect of rejection of opposition [1990/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.07.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.07.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US1639976 (JAMES BARRY); | [A]US2897536 (BERGSTROM RALPH W, et al); | [A]US3629903 (TURNER NADINE); | [A]DE2110080 ; | [A]US3982299 (KOMPAN LOUIS); | [A]US4385419 (CANTRELL GEORGE T); | [AP]FR2530927 (MAYER OSKAR FOODS [US]) |