EP0151820 - Lorry container for the transport of bulk with weighing device assuring correct load [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 07.03.1986 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GEBR. L. & A. GEUSENS in 't verkort : L.A.G., personenvennootschap met beperkte aansprakelijkheid Kanaallaan 54 B-3690 Bree / BE | [1985/34] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Geusens, Jaak Dennenhof 1 B-3690 BREE / BE | [1985/34] | Representative(s) | Donné, Eddy Bureau M.F.J. Bockstael nv. Arenbergstraat 13 2000 Antwerpen / BE | [N/P] |
Former [1985/34] | Donné, Eddy M.F.J.Bockstael Arenbergstraat 13 B-2000 Anvers / BE | Application number, filing date | 84201065.4 | 17.07.1984 | [1985/34] | Priority number, date | BE19832060278 | 07.12.1983 Original published format: BE 2060278 | [1985/34] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0151820 | Date: | 21.08.1985 | Language: | FR | [1985/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.05.1985 | Classification | IPC: | B60P5/00, G01G19/08 | [1985/34] | CPC: |
G01G19/08 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, IT, LI, LU, SE [1985/34] | Title | German: | Lastwagenbehälter für den Transport von Schüttgütern mit Wägeeinrichtung zum Sichern einer korrekten Fördermenge | [1985/34] | English: | Lorry container for the transport of bulk with weighing device assuring correct load | [1985/34] | French: | Camion-réservoir pour le transport de marchandises en vrac à dispositif de pesage assurant un débitage précis | [1985/34] | File destroyed: | 14.12.1992 | Examination procedure | 18.02.1986 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1986/17] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]FR2159623 ; | [Y]US3702661 ; | [A]DE1938458U ; | [A]DE2601834 ; | [A]GB1138831 |