EP0132893 - Olefin polymerization catalyst and process [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.10.1988 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states STAUFFER CHEMICAL COMPANY Westport Connecticut 06880 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1985/07] | For all designated states STAUFFER CHEMICAL COMPANY Westport Connecticut 06880 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Band, Elliot Isaac 23 Hatch Terrace Dobbs Ferry, NY 10522 / US | 02 /
Breen, Michael Joseph RR 1, Box 646 Campbell Hall, NY 10916 / US | 03 /
Mink, Robert Ivan 15 Nassau Road - Apt. 2 Yonkers, NY 10710 / US | 04 /
Via, Francis Anthony 2389 Ridge Street Yorktown Heights, NY 10598 / US | [1985/07] | Representative(s) | Urbanus, Henricus Maria, et al c/o Vereenigde Octrooibureaux Nieuwe Parklaan 107 2587 BP 's-Gravenhage / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1985/07] | Urbanus, Henricus Maria, Ir., et al c/o Vereenigde Octrooibureaux Nieuwe Parklaan 107 NL-2587 BP 's-Gravenhage / NL | Application number, filing date | 84201080.3 | 20.07.1984 | [1985/07] | Priority number, date | US19830516178 | 21.07.1983 Original published format: US 516178 | US19830535969 | 26.09.1983 Original published format: US 535969 | [1985/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0132893 | Date: | 13.02.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/07] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.11.1984 | Classification | IPC: | C08F10/00, C08F4/64 | [1985/07] | CPC: |
C08F10/00 (EP);
C08F4/6421 (KR);
C08F2/38 (KR);
C08F4/6543 (KR);
C08F4/65912 (KR)
| C-Set: |
C08F10/00, C08F4/6425 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1985/07] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Katalysator zur Polymerisation von Olefinen | [1985/07] | English: | Olefin polymerization catalyst and process | [1985/07] | French: | Procédé et catalyseur pour la polymérisation d'oléfines | [1985/07] | File destroyed: | 05.08.1994 | Examination procedure | 05.08.1985 | Examination requested [1985/42] | 14.01.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.04.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.12.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.04.1988 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1988/49] | 08.07.1988 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1988/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.07.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.07.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 01.08.1988 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]GB1549793 (STAMICARBON); | [XD]US4234710 (MOBERLY CHARLES W, et al); | [XPD]EP0101136 (STAUFFER CHEMICAL CO [US]) |