EP0141444 - Method and device for manufacturing a cake of compound soap, cake of soap thus composed and elements of soap material [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 03.03.1988 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Calstock Corporation N.V. No. 62 De Ruyterkade Curaçao The Netherlands Antilles / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1985/20] | For all designated states Calstock Corporation N.V. No. 62 De Ruyterkade Curaçao The Netherlands Antilles / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Van Vilsteren, Johannes Theodorus Maria Loosdrechtseweg 156 NL-1215 RC Hilversum / NL | [1985/20] | Representative(s) | Schumann, Bernard Herman Johan, et al Arnold & Siedsma Bezuidenhoutseweg 57 2594 AC The Hague / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1985/20] | Schumann, Bernard Herman Johan, et al Arnold & Siedsma, Advocaten en Octrooigemachtigden, Sweelinckplein 1 NL-2517 GK Den Haag / NL | Application number, filing date | 84201300.5 | 10.09.1984 | [1985/20] | Priority number, date | NL19830003197 | 15.09.1983 Original published format: NL 8303197 | [1985/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0141444 | Date: | 15.05.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.03.1985 | Classification | IPC: | C11D13/16, C11D13/28, C11D13/08, C11D13/18 | [1985/20] | CPC: |
C11D13/16 (EP);
C11D13/08 (EP);
C11D13/14 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1985/20] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Herstellung eines zusammengesetzten Seifenstückes, auf diese Weise zusammengesetztes Seifenstück und Bestandteile von Seifenmaterial | [1985/20] | English: | Method and device for manufacturing a cake of compound soap, cake of soap thus composed and elements of soap material | [1985/20] | French: | Procédé et appareil pour la préparation d'une barre de savon composée, barre de savon ainsi composée et éléments constituant le savon | [1985/20] | File destroyed: | 05.08.1994 | Examination procedure | 07.11.1985 | Examination requested [1986/04] | 04.04.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.06.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.10.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.02.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.04.1987 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 08.07.1987 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.11.1987 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination [1988/16] | 29.11.1987 | Application refused, date of legal effect [1988/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.03.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 01.10.1986 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   14.03.1987 | 30.09.1987 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]AT367793B (BLENDAX WERKE SCHNEIDER CO [DE]); | [Y]US2563839 (HOOPES PENROSE R); | [Y]FR1551437 ; | [AD]NL7810659 (JOHANNES THEODORUS MARIA VAN V); | [A]FR2187904 (LANCRI PAUL [MC]); | [A]AT367792B (BLENDAX WERKE SCHNEIDER CO [DE]); | [A]FR2364268 (FABRE SA PIERRE [FR]) |