EP0140410 - Novel enzyme product and its use in the saccharification of starch [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 18.10.1996 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.10.2005 | Change: Appeal number | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GIST-BROCADES N.V. Wateringseweg 1 P.O. Box 1 NL-2600 MA Delft / NL | [1985/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ducroo, Paul Rue Mermoz 6 F-59133 Phalempin / FR | 02 /
Labout, Johannes Jacobus Maria Alberdingk Thijmlaan 8 NL-2106 EK Heemstede / NL | 03 /
Noordam, Bertus Wagenaarhof 19 NL-2692 BJ 's-Gravenzande / NL | [1985/19] | Representative(s) | Armitage, Ian Michael, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP York House 23 Kingsway London WC2B 6HP / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1995/49] | Armitage, Ian Michael, et al MEWBURN ELLIS York House 23 Kingsway London WC2B 6HP / GB | ||
Former [1985/19] | Huygens, Arthur Victor, Dr. c/o Gist-Brocades N.V. Patents & Trademarks Department Martinus Nijhofflaan 2 PO Box 1 NL-2600 MA Delft / NL | Application number, filing date | 84201301.3 | 10.09.1984 | [1985/19] | Priority number, date | EP19830201303 | 11.09.1983 Original published format: EP 83201303 | [1985/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0140410 | Date: | 08.05.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0140410 | Date: | 17.11.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/46] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP0140410 | Date: | 04.12.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/49] | Type: | B2 RE Reissue of amended patent specification | No.: | EP0140410 | Date: | 26.11.1997 | [1997/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.02.1985 | Classification | IPC: | C12N9/30, C12N9/34, C12P19/20 | [1985/19] | CPC: |
C12N9/242 (EP);
C12N9/2428 (EP);
C12P19/20 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1985/19] | Title | German: | Enzymprodukt und seine Verwendung in der Verzuckerung von Stärke | [1985/19] | English: | Novel enzyme product and its use in the saccharification of starch | [1985/19] | French: | Produit enzymatique et son application dans la saccharification de l'amidon | [1985/19] | Examination procedure | 30.05.1985 | Examination requested [1985/34] | 12.11.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M05) | 22.04.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.10.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.12.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.03.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 17.05.1988 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.05.1988 | Fee for grant paid | 30.05.1988 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
12.08.1989
28.08.1989
ADMISSIBLE Kali-Chemie Aktiengesellschaft Hans-Böckler-Alle 20 D-30173 Hannover / DE | 02
16.08.1989
13.10.1989
ADMISSIBLE Novo-Nordisk A/S Novo Alle DK-2880 Bagsvaerd / DK Opponent's representative Brown, John D. Boehmert & Boehmert Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1989/41] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
12.08.1989
28.08.1989
ADMISSIBLE Kali-Chemie Aktiengesellschaft Hans-Böckler-Alle 20 D-30173 Hannover / DE | ||
02
16.08.1989
13.10.1989
ADMISSIBLE Novo-Nordisk A/S Novo Alle DK-2880 Bagsvaerd / DK Opponent's representative Brown, John David FORRESTER & BOEHMERT Franz-Joseph-Strasse 38 D-80801 München / DE | 18.10.1989 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 15.05.1990 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 22.12.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M04) | 23.02.1995 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 13.03.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M02) | 18.05.1995 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 31.07.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M04) | 08.12.1995 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 11.03.1996 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 17.04.1996 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 02.07.1996 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 30.09.1996 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Appeal following opposition | 14.01.1991 | Appeal received No. T0089/91 | 19.04.1991 | Statement of grounds filed | 09.11.1993 | Result of appeal procedure: maintenance in amended form | 09.11.1993 | Date of oral proceedings | 15.11.1993 | Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.07.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.08.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.07.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB1037710 (CORN PRODUCTS CO); | [A]GB1106421 (KENNETH FRED MELLOR); | [A]US4017363 (MCMULLEN WILLIAM H, et al); | [A]GB2016476 (WALKER & SONS INC HIRAM); | [A]US4284722 (TAMURI MASAKI, et al); | [AD]EP0063909 | [X] - DIE STÄRKE, vol. 27, no. 11, November 1975, pages 377-383, Weinheim, DE; J.J. MARSHALL: "Starch-degrading enzymes, old and new" | [X] - STARCH/STÄRKE, vol. 30, no. 8, 1978, pages 272-275, Verlag Chemie GmbH, Weinheim, DE; N. RAMACHANDRAN et al.: "Studies on the thermophilic amylolytic enzymes of a strain of Aspergillus niger" | [A] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 73, no. 17, 26th October 1970, page 35, no. 84092z, Columbus, Ohio, USA; J.J. MARSHALL et al.: "Incomplete conversion of glycogen and starch by crystalline amyloglucosidase and its importance in the determination of amylaceous polymers" & FEBS (FED. EUR. BIOCHEM. SOC.) LETT. | [A] - STARCH/STÄRKE, vol. 30, no. 10, 1978, pages 341-345, Verlag Chemie GmbH, Weinheim, DE; P. FINCH et al.: "Comparative studies on glucoamylases isolated from a strain of Aspergillus" | [A] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 96, no. 3, 18th January 1982, page 208, no. 17141b, Columbus, Ohio, USA; G.I. KVESITADZE et al.: "Selection of microscopic fungi producing acid-stable alpha-amylase and glucoamylase" & MIKROBIOLOGIYA 1981, 50(5), 807-812 | [A] - DIE STÄRKE, vol. 27, no. 4, 1975, pages 123-128, Weinheim, DE; S. UEDA et al.: "Multiple forms of glucoamylase of rhizopus species" |