EP0174396 - A device for controlling the tilting movement of a driver's cab on a vehicle [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 14.04.1987 Database last updated on 20.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Applied Power Inc. 250 South Executive Drive Brookfield Wisconsin 53005 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1986/12] | For all designated states Applied Power Inc. 250 South Executive Drive Brookfield Wisconsin 53005 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sonneborn, Lambertus Johannes Waterhamskamp 15 NL-7576 EM Oldenzaal / NL | [1986/12] | Representative(s) | Boelsma, Gerben Harm, et al Exter Polak & Charlouis B.V. (EP&C) P.O. Box 3241 2280 GE Rijswijk / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1986/12] | Boelsma, Gerben Harm, Ir., et al van Exter Polak & Charlouis B.V., P.O. Box 3241 NL-2280 GE Rijswijk / NL | Application number, filing date | 84201310.4 | 11.09.1984 | [1986/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0174396 | Date: | 19.03.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.06.1985 | Classification | IPC: | B62D33/06 | [1986/12] | CPC: |
B62D33/071 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1986/12] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zur Kippbewegungssteuerung des Fahrerhauses eines Fahrzeugs | [1986/12] | English: | A device for controlling the tilting movement of a driver's cab on a vehicle | [1986/12] | French: | Dispositif de commande du basculement de la cabine d'un véhicule | [1986/12] | File destroyed: | 25.05.1993 | Examination procedure | 20.11.1986 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1987/23] | 07.01.1987 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1987/23] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 19.09.1986 | M02   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.1986 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3695710 ; | [AD]US4440252 ; | [A]GB2121114 |