EP0158746 - Visualization method for the direct or indirect detection of the reaction between a specific binding agent and the corresponding acceptor substance in blot overlay assays [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.04.1992 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.04.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 03.06.1992 [1992/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Janssen Pharmaceutica NV Turnhoutseweg 30 2340 Beerse / BE | [N/P] |
Former [1985/43] | For all designated states JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICA N.V. Turnhoutsebaan 30 B-2340 Beerse / BE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Moeremans, Marc K. J. J. Donk 90 B-2400 Mol / BE | 02 /
Daneels, Guido F. T. Doolstraat 57 B-2452 Gierle / BE | 03 /
De Mey, Jan R. Collegestraat 56, bus J B-2300 Turnhout / BE | [1985/43] | Application number, filing date | 84201559.6 | 31.10.1984 | [1985/43] | Priority number, date | GB19830031514 | 25.11.1983 Original published format: GB 8331514 | [1985/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0158746 | Date: | 23.10.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/43] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0158746 | Date: | 23.09.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0158746 | Date: | 12.06.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.08.1987 | Classification | IPC: | G01N33/58, G01N33/544 | [1987/39] | CPC: |
G01N33/532 (EP,US);
C12Q1/00 (KR);
G01N33/559 (EP,US);
Y10S436/805 (EP,US);
Y10S436/807 (EP,US);
Y10S436/824 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1987/36] | G01N33/58, G01N33/544 | ||
Former IPC [1985/43] | G01N33/553 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1985/43] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur optischen Anzeige der direkten oder indirekten Bestimmung der Reaktion zwischen einem spezifischen Bindungsmittel und der korrespondierenden Akzeptorsubstanz in "Blot overlay"-Testverfahren | [1985/43] | English: | Visualization method for the direct or indirect detection of the reaction between a specific binding agent and the corresponding acceptor substance in blot overlay assays | [1985/43] | French: | Méthode de visualisation pour la détection directe ou indirecte de la réaction entre un agent de liaison spécifique et la substance acceptrice correspondante dans des essais "blot overlay" | [1985/43] | Examination procedure | 20.03.1986 | Examination requested [1986/22] | 16.06.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.12.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.04.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 18.06.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.08.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 31.08.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 17.09.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.11.1990 | Fee for grant paid | 30.11.1990 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.03.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit [1992/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.10.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.10.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.10.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 09.10.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.10.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]FR2353854 (TECHNION RES & DEV FOUNDATION [IL]); | [X]EP0007654 (AKZO NV [NL]); | [A]US4203724 (ENOMOTO SHOGO [JP], et al); | [A]US4208185 (ENOMOTO SHOGO [JP], et al); | [XP]US4420558 (DE MEY JAN R [BE], et al); | [E]EP0173629 (CYTOGEN CORP [US]) | [XP] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 101, 5th November 1984, page 496, abstract no. 168633m, Columbus, Ohio, US; Y.H. HSU: "Immunogold for detection of antigen on nitrocellulose paper", & ANAL. BIOCHEM. 1984, 142(1), 221-5 | [XP] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 102, 14th July 1985, page 437, abstract no. 94024k, Columbus, Ohio, US; M. MOEREMANS et al.: "Sensitive visualization of antigen-antibody reactions in dot and blot immune overlay assays with immunogold and immunogold/silver staining", & J. IMMUNOL. METHODS 1984, 74(2), 353-60 | [XP] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 101, 10th September 1984, page 376, abstract no. 87638q, Columbus, Ohio, US; U. ZUR NIEDEN et al.: "Dictyosomes participate in the intracellular pathway of storage proteins in developing Vicia faba cotyledons", & EUR. J. CELL BIOL. 1984, 34(1), 9-17 | [XP] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 102, 7th January 1985, page 311, abstract no. 163185c, Columbus, Ohio, US; M. MOEREMANS et al.: "Sensitive colloidal metal (gold or silver) staining of protein blots on nitrocellulose membranes", & ANAL. BIOCHEM. 1985, 145(2), 315-21 | Examination | - PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES USA, vol. 76, no. 9, 1979; p. 4350 | - ANALYTICAL BIOCHEMISTRY, vol. 124, 1982; p. 396 |