EP0180666 - A tubular casing for foodstuffs [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.06.1990 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.1993 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 25.08.1993 [1993/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states International Chemical Engineering AG Neugasse 13-15 Vaduz / LI | [1986/20] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Prohn, Christiaan Martin Pflugstrasse 7 FL-9490 Vaduz / LI | [1986/20] | Representative(s) | Smulders, Theodorus A.H.J., et al Vereenigde Postbus 87930 2508 DH Den Haag / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1989/16] | Smulders, Theodorus A.H.J., Ir., et al Vereenigde Octrooibureaux Nieuwe Parklaan 97 NL-2587 BN 's-Gravenhage / NL | ||
Former [1986/20] | Urbanus, Henricus Maria, Ir. c/o Vereenigde Octrooibureaux Nieuwe Parklaan 107 NL-2587 BP 's-Gravenhage / NL | Application number, filing date | 84201601.6 | 05.11.1984 | [1986/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0180666 | Date: | 14.05.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0180666 | Date: | 26.07.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.08.1985 | Classification | IPC: | A22C13/00, B29C53/30 | [1986/20] | CPC: |
A22C13/00 (EP);
B29C53/30 (EP);
B29C61/025 (EP);
B29C67/0014 (EP);
B29L2023/002 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1986/20] | Title | German: | Schlauchhülle für Nahrungsprodukte | [1986/20] | English: | A tubular casing for foodstuffs | [1986/20] | French: | Enveloppe tubulaire pour produits alimentaires | [1986/20] | Examination procedure | 12.11.1986 | Examination requested [1987/02] | 19.04.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.09.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.10.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 31.01.1989 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.04.1989 | Fee for grant paid | 27.04.1989 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.04.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit [1990/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.11.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.12.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.11.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 01.12.1987 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   31.12.1987 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR1122078 (TRANSPARENT PACKAGE COMPANY); | [Y]US2819488 (LAWRENCE GIMBEL); | [A]US2961323 (FREDERICK UNDERWOOD WILLIAM, et al); | [X]US3000057 (THEODORE SWEDLOW, et al); | [Y]GB922908 (UNION CARBIDE CORP); | [AD]DE1253093 (REINTJES EISENWERKE); | [A]DE1432502 (FREUDENBERG CARL FA); | [A]GB1151687 (TEE PAK INC [US]); | [A]GB1180067 (UNION CARBIDE CORP [US]); | [Y]US3798301 (SCHUCKS, et al); | [A]EP0031892 (KOLLROSS GUENTER); | [A]EP0087241 (DEVRO INC [US]) |