EP0143491 - Detergent composition [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.01.1990 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.07.2008 | Change - applicant | published on 06.08.2008 [2008/32] | Applicant(s) | For:AT
BE
CH
DE
FR
IT
LI
NL
SE
Unilever N.V. Weena 455 3013 AL Rotterdam / NL | For:GB
Unilever PLC Unilever House Blackfriars London Greater London EC4P 4BQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/32] | For:AT
BE
CH
DE
FR
IT
LI
NL
SE
Unilever N.V. Weena 455 3013 AL Rotterdam / NL | ||
For:GB
Unilever PLC Unilever House Blackfriars London EC4P 4BQ / GB | |||
Former [1985/23] | For:AT
BE
CH
DE
FR
IT
LI
NL
SE
UNILEVER N.V. Weena 455 NL-3013 AL Rotterdam / NL | ||
For:GB
UNILEVER PLC Unilever House Blackfriars P.O. Box 68 London EC4P 4BQ / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Clements, Anthony Henry Bodmaelor Ffrwd Road Cefn y bedd nr Wrexham Clwyd Wales LL12 9SF / GB | [1985/23] | Representative(s) | Tan, Bian An, et al Unilever N.V. Patent Division P.O. Box 137 NL-3130 AC Vlaardingen / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1985/23] | Tan, Bian An, Ir., et al Unilever N.V. Patent Division P.O. Box 137 NL-3130 AC Vlaardingen / NL | Application number, filing date | 84201655.2 | 15.11.1984 | [1985/23] | Priority number, date | GB19830031278 | 23.11.1983 Original published format: GB 8331278 | [1985/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0143491 | Date: | 05.06.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/23] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0143491 | Date: | 30.10.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0143491 | Date: | 22.03.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.08.1985 | Classification | IPC: | C11D3/39, C11D3/395 | [1985/23] | CPC: |
C11D3/3932 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1985/23] | Title | German: | Reinigungsmittelzusammensetzung | [1985/31] | English: | Detergent composition | [1985/23] | French: | Composition détergente | [1985/31] | Examination procedure | 26.11.1984 | Examination requested [1985/23] | 18.11.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.03.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.06.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.08.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.12.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.02.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.06.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 23.09.1988 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.10.1988 | Fee for grant paid | 17.10.1988 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.12.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit [1990/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.11.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.11.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.11.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 22.03.1989 | BE | 22.03.1989 | [1991/08] |
Former [1990/09] | AT | 22.03.1989 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]DD141844 ; | [Y]FR1515237 (COLGATE PALMOLIVE CO); | [Y]FR2253823 (COLGATE PALMOLIVE CO [US]); | [Y]EP0072166 (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US], et al) | [Y] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 94, no. 1 , May 1981, pages 108-109, no. 141604c, Columbus, Ohio, US; & DD-A-141 844 (R. OPITZ et al.) 21-05-1980, & DD141844 A 00000000 | Examination | EP0025608 |