EP0146163 - A bituminous composition comprising polymers [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.11.1988 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.11.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 28.12.1988 [1988/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Shell Internationale Research Maatschappij B.V. Carel van Bylandtlaan 30 2596 HR Den Haag / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1985/26] | For all designated states SHELL INTERNATIONALE RESEARCH MAATSCHAPPIJ B.V. Carel van Bylandtlaan 30 NL-2596 HR Den Haag / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Mikols, Wayne John 20302 Laurellock Katy Texas 77450 / US | [1985/26] | Representative(s) | Aalbers, Onno, et al P.O. Box 162 2501 AN Den Haag / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1985/26] | Aalbers, Onno, et al P.O. Box 162 NL-2501 AN The Hague / NL | Application number, filing date | 84201678.4 | 20.11.1984 | [1985/26] | Priority number, date | US19830562253 | 16.12.1983 Original published format: US 562253 | [1985/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0146163 | Date: | 26.06.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/26] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0146163 | Date: | 07.08.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0146163 | Date: | 23.12.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.06.1985 | Classification | IPC: | C08L95/00, C08L53/00 | [1985/26] | CPC: |
C08L53/02 (EP,US);
C08L95/00 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C08L53/02, C08L2666/02 (EP,US);
C08L95/00, C08L2666/24 (US,EP) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1985/26] | Title | German: | Bituminöse, Polymere enthaltende Mischung | [1985/26] | English: | A bituminous composition comprising polymers | [1985/26] | French: | Composition bitumineuse contenant des polymères | [1985/26] | Examination procedure | 20.11.1984 | Examination requested [1986/09] | 27.08.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.11.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.12.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.01.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.03.1987 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 23.06.1987 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.09.1987 | Fee for grant paid | 07.09.1987 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.09.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit [1988/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.10.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.10.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2090938 (SHELL INT RESEARCH); | [A]FR2283179 (SHELL INT RESEARCH [NL]); | [A]EP0009209 (PHILLIPS PETROLEUM CO [US]); | [A]US4277575 (HAAF WILLIAM R, et al) |